EP3600981 - ELECTROPNEUMATIC HAND BRAKE (EPH) HAVING INTEGRATED TCV (EUROPEAN AND SCANDINAVIAN CONTROL) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Europe BV Chaussée de la Hulpe 166 1170 Brussels / BE | [2022/08] |
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states WABCO GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover Niedersachsen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN THIEL, Julian Nelkenweg 7 30938 Grossburgwedel / DE | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Rabe, Dirk-Heinrich, et al ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2023/31] |
Former [2020/06] | Schiller, Harald Wabco GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 18715530.4 | 21.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018EP57119 | Priority number, date | DE20171002715 | 21.03.2017 Original published format: DE102017002715 | DE20171006356 | 24.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017006356 | [2020/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018172394 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3600981 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3600981 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/04, B60T13/66, B60T13/68 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
B60T7/02 (EP);
B60T13/683 (US);
B60T13/38 (EP);
B60T13/385 (US);
B60T13/58 (US);
B60T13/66 (EP);
B60T13/68 (EP);
B60T15/18 (EP);
B60T15/181 (EP);
B60T15/182 (EP);
B60T15/20 (EP);
B60T15/203 (EP,US);
B60T15/206 (EP,US);
B60T7/04 (EP);
B60T7/042 (EP);
B60T7/085 (EP,US);
B60T7/107 (EP);
B60T7/20 (EP,US);
B60T8/1708 (EP);
B60T8/323 (EP);
B60T8/341 (EP);
B60T8/342 (US);
B60T8/343 (EP,US);
B60T8/3605 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRO-PNEUMATISCHE HANDBREMSE (EPH) MIT INTEGRIERTEM TCV (EUROPÄISCHE UND SKANDINAVISCHE ANSTEUERUNG) | [2020/06] | English: | ELECTROPNEUMATIC HAND BRAKE (EPH) HAVING INTEGRATED TCV (EUROPEAN AND SCANDINAVIAN CONTROL) | [2020/06] | French: | FREIN À MAIN ÉLECTRO-PNEUMATIQUE (EPH) AVEC VALVE TCV (SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE EUROPÉEN ET SCANDINAVE) INTÉGRÉE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 21.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | IT | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
IT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102005060225 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102007038472 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102007047691 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102008009043 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [A]DE102008014458 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009152982 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2615003 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2821303 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016169975 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2016177475 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,12-15,17-22,26 * von Seite 2, Zeile 26 bis Seite 4, Zeile 13, Figuren 2 und 3, Seite 12, Zeile 28-35 und Seite 13, Zeile 25-35, Seite 14, Zeile 1-8 * [I] 5-11,16,23-25; | [A]DE102015112490 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME FUER NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102004051309 | DE102007047691 | DE102008014458 | DE102012000435 | DE102016003034 | DE102015112490 |