EP3606574 - DISPOSABLE PUMP CHAMBER FOR AN INFUSION PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam 2066717 / IL | [2022/24] |
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALGAWI, Yehuda c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufah Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 02 /
GOVARI, Assaf c/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. P.O. Box 275 4 Hatnufah Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2024/14] |
Former [2020/07] | Small, Gary James Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18715967.8 | 14.03.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018IB51697 | Priority number, date | US201715481264 | 06.04.2017 Original published format: US201715481264 | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018185579 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606574 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3606574 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00, A61M3/02, F04B43/02 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
A61M3/0254 (EP,IL);
F04B23/028 (IL);
F04B43/02 (IL,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,IL);
A61M1/77 (EP);
A61M3/02 (EP,IL);
A61M5/14224 (IL,US);
F04B17/042 (EP,IL);
F04B43/0054 (US);
F04B43/04 (EP,IL);
F04B53/16 (EP,IL,US);
F04B9/02 (IL);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,IL);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINWEGPUMPENKAMMER FÜR EINE INFUSIONSPUMPE | [2020/07] | English: | DISPOSABLE PUMP CHAMBER FOR AN INFUSION PUMP | [2020/07] | French: | CHAMBRE DE POMPE JETABLE POUR POMPE À PERFUSION | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 08.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 09.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24167241.9 / EP4368835 | Request for further processing for: | 09.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5392653 (ZANGER FRANK [US], et al); | [X]US2014161644 (WEATHERLEY RICHARD [GB]); | [X]US2016051740 (WEGENER CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) | by applicant | US4445535 | US4856340 | US5391199 | US5443489 | US5540568 | US5558091 | US5944022 | US5983126 | US6172499 | US6177792 | US6456864 | US6690963 | US6749587 | US6788967 | US7427281 | US7753880 | US8827945 | US8834408 | US8915879 | US2016235913 |