EP3596908 - SYSTEM TO FILTER IMPOSSIBLE USER TRAVEL INDICATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2020/04] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BE'ERY, Tal Arieh Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
LUTTWAK, Ami Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2020/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18716017.1 | 06.03.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018US20992 | Priority number, date | US201715457554 | 13.03.2017 Original published format: US201715457554 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018169714 | Date: | 20.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3596908 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3596908 | Date: | 02.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L29/06, G06F21/31 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
G06F21/316 (EP,US);
H04L63/0876 (US);
H04L63/107 (EP,US);
H04L63/1416 (US);
H04L63/1425 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM FILTERN VON UNMÖGLICHEN BENUTZERREISEINDIKATOREN | [2021/37] | English: | SYSTEM TO FILTER IMPOSSIBLE USER TRAVEL INDICATORS | [2020/04] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FILTRATION D'INDICATEURS DE DÉPLACEMENT D'UTILISATEUR IMPOSSIBLES | [2021/37] |
Former [2020/04] | SYSTEM ZUM FILTERN VON NICHT MÖGLICHEN BENUTZERFAHRTINDIKATOREN | ||
Former [2020/04] | SYSTÈME POUR FILTRER DES INDICATEURS DE DÉPLACEMENT D'UTILISATEUR IMPOSSIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 09.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2018 | AL | 02.02.2022 | AT | 02.02.2022 | CY | 02.02.2022 | CZ | 02.02.2022 | DK | 02.02.2022 | EE | 02.02.2022 | ES | 02.02.2022 | FI | 02.02.2022 | HR | 02.02.2022 | IT | 02.02.2022 | LT | 02.02.2022 | LV | 02.02.2022 | MC | 02.02.2022 | MK | 02.02.2022 | MT | 02.02.2022 | NL | 02.02.2022 | PL | 02.02.2022 | RO | 02.02.2022 | RS | 02.02.2022 | SE | 02.02.2022 | SI | 02.02.2022 | SK | 02.02.2022 | SM | 02.02.2022 | TR | 02.02.2022 | IE | 06.03.2022 | LU | 06.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | BG | 02.05.2022 | NO | 02.05.2022 | GR | 03.05.2022 | IS | 02.06.2022 | PT | 02.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.03.2018 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CY | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
MK | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
TR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 06.03.2018 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CY | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
MK | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CY | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
MK | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CY | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
IE | 06.03.2022 | ||
LU | 06.03.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 02.02.2022 | |
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 02.02.2022 | |
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 02.02.2022 | |
NO | 02.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008059474 (LIM KENG [US]) [X] 1,7,14 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 15 - paragraph 23 * * page 55, paragraph 734 - paragraph 737 * * page 56, paragraph 752 - page 58, paragraph 771 * * the whole document * [I] 1-15; | [A]US2016105801 (WITTENBERG CRAIG HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 * * page 3, paragraph 33 - paragraph 39 ** claims 1-20 * |