EP3768705 - MULTIVALENT BINDING MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.09.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Stuttgart Keplerstr. 7 70569 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIFERT, Oliver Zuffenhäuser Heide 1 70437 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
KONTERMANN, Roland Gothaer Str. 6 72622 Nürtingen / DE | 03 /
RICHTER, Fabian Cranachweg 11 73230 Kirchheim unter Teck / DE | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 18716145.0 | 22.03.2018 | [2021/04] | WO2018EP57331 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019179627 | Date: | 26.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3768705 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, C07K16/28, C07K16/32, C07K16/46 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,US);
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
A61K39/39533 (US);
A61P35/00 (US);
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
C07K16/468 (EP);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2317/30 (US);
C07K2317/526 (EP,US);
C07K2317/60 (EP,US);
C07K2317/62 (EP,US);
C07K2317/64 (EP,US);
C07K2317/66 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,US);
C07K2317/90 (EP);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
C07K2317/94 (EP,US);
G01N33/5091 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Title | German: | MULTIVALENTE BINDUNGSMOLEKÜLE | [2021/04] | English: | MULTIVALENT BINDING MOLECULES | [2021/04] | French: | MOLÉCULES DE LIAISON MULTIVALENTES | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 09.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0202781 (VLAAMS INTERUNIV INST BIOTECH [BE], et al) [X] 1,3-7,10,15 * page 8, line 19 - line 21 * * page 6, line 25 - line 28 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 2,8,9,11-14; | [Y]WO2007024715 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [A]WO2013156148 (UNIV STUTTGART [DE]) [A] 5-8 * page 1 - page 2 *; | [XI]US2014213772 (GHAYUR TARIQ [US], et al) [X] 1-10,15 * paragraph [0128]; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 11-14; | [A] - SPIESS CHRISTOPH ET AL, "Alternative molecular formats and therapeutic applications for bispecific antibodies", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, (20150127), vol. 67, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.MOLIMM.2015.01.003, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 95 - 106, XP029246892 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2015.01.003 | [Y] - ANKE STEINMETZ ET AL, "CODV-Ig, a universal bispecific tetravalent and multifunctional immunoglobulin format for medical applications", MABS, US, (20160316), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:10.1080/19420862.2016.1162932, ISSN 1942-0862, pages 867 - 878, XP055343765 [Y] 1-15 * page 868, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/19420862.2016.1162932 | by applicant | US2003118592 | US2003133939 | - PRESTA, LG., "Molecular engineering and design of therapeutic antibodies", Curr Opin. Immunol., (20080000), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1016/j.coi.2008.06.012, pages 460 - 470, XP025771205 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.coi.2008.06.012 | - KONTERMANN, "Dual targeting strategies with bispecific antibodies", mAbs, (20120000), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.4161/mabs.4.2.19000, pages 182 - 197, XP009160769 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/mabs.4.2.19000 | - GARBER K., "Bispecific antibodies rise again", Nat. Rev. Drug Discov., (20140000), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd4478, pages 799 - 801, XP055242329 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd4478 | - BRINKMANN; KONTERMANN, "The making of bispecific antibodies", mAbs, (20170000), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1080/19420862.2016.1268307, pages 182 - 212, XP055374463 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/19420862.2016.1268307 | - SEGAL et al., "Bispecific antibodies in cancer therapy", Curr. Opin. Immunol., (19990000), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/S0952-7915(99)00015-1, pages 558 - 562, XP004257585 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0952-7915(99)00015-1 | - KONTERMANN; BRINKMANN, "Bispecific antibodies", Drug Discov. Today, (20150000), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1016/j.drudis.2015.02.008, pages 838 - 847, XP055251363 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.drudis.2015.02.008 | - SPIESS et al., "Alternative molecular formats and therapeutic applications for bispecific antibodies", Mol. Immunol., (20150000), vol. 67, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molimm.2015.01.003, pages 95 - 106, XP029246892 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2015.01.003 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - BIRD et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUSTON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - HOLLIGER P. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19930000), vol. 90, no. 14, pages 6444 - 6448 | - BRODY E.N.; GOLD L., "Aptamers as therapeutic and diagnostic agents", J. Biotechnol., (20000000), vol. 74, no. 1, pages 5 - 13, XP009031105 | - BINZ H.K. et al., "Engineering novel binding proteins from nonimmunoglobulin domains", Nat. Biotechnol., (20050000), vol. 23, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1127, pages 1257 - 1268, XP002381839 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1127 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19700000), vol. 2, page 482 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nuc. Acids Res., (19770000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 89, page 10915 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5887 | - NIELSEN et al., Science, (19910000), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500 | - CHUDAKOV et al., Physiol. Rev., (20100000), vol. 90, pages 1103 - 1163 |