EP3776928 - IDENTIFICATION OF LOW PERFORMING RADIO BRANCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIDIAN, Namir Bygatan 37 171 49 Solna / SE | 02 /
GÖRANSSON, Bo Silverdalsvägen 67 191 38 Sollentuna / SE | 03 /
LARSSON, Erik Storgatan 7A 753 31 Uppsala / SE | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18716688.9 | 29.03.2018 | [2021/07] | WO2018SE50345 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019190371 | Date: | 03.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3776928 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/14, H04B17/15, H04B1/04, H01Q3/26, H04B7/0456, H04B7/06 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
H04B7/046 (EP,US);
H04B1/0466 (EP,US);
H01Q3/267 (EP,US);
H04B17/0085 (EP,US);
H04B17/14 (EP,US);
H04B17/17 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES FUNKZWEIGS MIT GERINGER LEISTUNG | [2021/07] | English: | IDENTIFICATION OF LOW PERFORMING RADIO BRANCH | [2021/07] | French: | IDENTIFICATION D'UNE BRANCHE RADIO À FAIBLE PERFORMANCE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 30.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018040964 (BENJEBBOUR ANASS [JP], et al); |