EP3637986 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CLEANING A TRAY IN AN ASSEMBLY LINE GROW POD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grow Solutions Tech LLC 487 East 1750 North Vineyard, Utah 84059 / US | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLAR, Gary Bret 5032 Old Oak Lane Highland, Utah 84003 / US | 02 /
STOTT, Mark Gerald 8774 North Cedar Fort Circle Eagle Mountain, Utah 84005 / US | 03 /
TUELLER, Todd Garrett 1035 East Alpine Drive Alpine, Utah 84004 / US | 04 /
HURST, Michael Stephen 945 West Burlington Farmington, Utah 84025 / US | 05 /
BENTLEY, Alan Ray 354 North Matterhorn Drive Alpine, Utah 84004 / US | 06 /
WOODBURY, Taylor John 1273 West 430 South Provo, Utah 84601 / US | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/17] | 01 /
MILLAR, Gary Bret 5032 Old Oak Lane Highland, Utah 84003 / US | ||
02 /
STOTT, Mark Gerald 8774 North Cedar Fort Circle Eagle Mountain, Utah 84005 / US | |||
03 /
TUELLER, Todd Garrett 125 East Main Street American Fork, Utah 84003 / US | |||
04 /
HURST, Michael Stephen 945 West Burlington Farmington, Utah 84025 / US | |||
05 /
BENTLEY, Alan Ray 354 North Matterhorn Drive Alpine, Utah 84004 / US | |||
06 /
WOODBURY, Taylor John 477 North 800 E. Provo, Utah 84006 / US | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18716811.7 | 22.03.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018US23825 | Priority number, date | US201762519442P | 14.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762519442 P | US201762519304P | 14.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762519304 P | US201815926746 | 20.03.2018 Original published format: US201815926746 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018231311 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3637986 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3637986 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/14, B08B9/08, A01G9/06, B65G21/18, B08B7/04, B08B13/00, // A01G31/04, B65G47/96 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A01G9/06 (EP,KR,US);
B65G45/22 (KR,US);
A01G31/042 (EP,KR,US);
A01G9/143 (EP,KR,US);
B08B13/00 (EP);
B08B7/04 (EP);
B08B9/0826 (EP);
B65G17/002 (KR,US);
B65G21/18 (EP,KR,US);
B65G47/965 (EP,KR,US);
A01G2009/1492 (KR,US);
B65G2201/0202 (KR,US);
B65G2207/24 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/48] | A01G9/14, B08B9/08, A01G9/06, // A01G31/04, B65G47/96, B65G21/18 | ||
Former IPC [2020/17] | A01G9/14, A01G31/04, B65G21/18, B65G47/96 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MD | 13.01.2020 | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND METHODEN ZUR REINIGUNG EINER PLATTE IN EINEM FLIESSBAND FÜR TÖPFE | [2020/48] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CLEANING A TRAY IN AN ASSEMBLY LINE GROW POD | [2020/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE NETTOYAGE D'UN PLATEAU SUR UN ENSEMBE DE LIGNE DE CAPSULE DE CROISSANCE | [2020/48] |
Former [2020/17] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINER SCHALE IN EINEM FLIESSBAND-ANZUCHTMODUL | ||
Former [2020/17] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE NETTOYAGE D'UN PLATEAU DANS UN MODULE DE CULTURE DE CHAÎNE DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 13.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21180628.6 / EP3933540 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2018 | AL | 23.06.2021 | AT | 23.06.2021 | CY | 23.06.2021 | CZ | 23.06.2021 | DK | 23.06.2021 | EE | 23.06.2021 | FI | 23.06.2021 | HR | 23.06.2021 | LT | 23.06.2021 | LV | 23.06.2021 | MC | 23.06.2021 | MK | 23.06.2021 | PL | 23.06.2021 | RO | 23.06.2021 | RS | 23.06.2021 | SE | 23.06.2021 | SI | 23.06.2021 | SK | 23.06.2021 | SM | 23.06.2021 | BG | 23.09.2021 | NO | 23.09.2021 | GR | 24.09.2021 | IS | 23.10.2021 | PT | 25.10.2021 | GB | 22.03.2022 | IE | 22.03.2022 | IT | 22.03.2022 | LU | 22.03.2022 | ES | 23.03.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
MK | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.03.2022 | ||
IT | 22.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CY | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.03.2022 | ||
IT | 22.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.03.2022 | ||
IT | 22.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.03.2022 | ||
IT | 22.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
GB | 22.03.2022 | ||
IE | 22.03.2022 | ||
LU | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
MC | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SI | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 23.06.2021 | |
AT | 23.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
DK | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
EE | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
PL | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
IS | 23.10.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
CZ | 23.06.2021 | ||
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RO | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SK | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
PT | 25.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 23.06.2021 | |
FI | 23.06.2021 | ||
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
SM | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
RS | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
HR | 23.06.2021 | ||
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
LV | 23.06.2021 | ||
SE | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
NO | 23.09.2021 | ||
GR | 24.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | ||
BG | 23.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 23.06.2021 | |
LT | 23.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3771258 (CHARNEY A) [Y] 1-4,6 * abstract * * figures 1-8 * * column 3, line 17 - column 6, line 59 *; | [A]US5388681 (BONNET HENRI [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-12 ** column 3, line 48 - column 15, line 68 *; | [Y]WO0146048 (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * page 4, line 21 - page 8, line 5 *; | [Y]WO2013066254 (PLANTAGON INT AB [SE]) [Y] 5,7-20 * abstract * * figures 1-12 * * pages 8-9 * * page 13, line 23 - page 20, line 17 * |