EP3612436 - REINFORCING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/09] | REINFORCEMENT ELEMENT | ||
[2020/48] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAN, Xuping 44504 Midway Drive Novi, Michigan 48375 / US | 02 /
HELFERTY, Raymond 50345 Pinnacle Woods Macomb, Michigan 48042 / US | 03 /
NIEZUR, Michael 29929 Vernon Drive Southfield, Michigan 48076 / US | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/09] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 18717933.8 | 18.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018EP59848 | Priority number, date | EP20170167611 | 21.04.2017 Original published format: EP 17167611 | [2020/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018192946 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612436 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3612436 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/00, B62D29/00 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
B62D25/00 (EP,US);
B62D27/026 (US);
B62D29/002 (EP);
B62D29/004 (EP);
B62D29/043 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKUNGSELEMENT | [2020/09] | English: | REINFORCING ELEMENT | [2020/48] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE RENFORT | [2020/48] |
Former [2020/09] | REINFORCEMENT ELEMENT | ||
Former [2020/09] | ÉLÉMENT DE RENFORCEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 21.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.2021
13.12.2021
ADMISSIBLE L & L Products Europe S.A.S. 1, Rue Lindberg ZA Activeum, Altorf 67129 Molsheim, Cedex / FR Opponent's representative Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2022/03] | 03.01.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.04.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.10.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.10.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 04.12.2023 | Appeal received No. T1949/23 | 04.12.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 13.02.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.12.2023 | Appeal received No. T1949/23 | 05.12.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 09.02.2024 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2018 | AL | 10.03.2021 | CY | 10.03.2021 | CZ | 10.03.2021 | DK | 10.03.2021 | EE | 10.03.2021 | ES | 10.03.2021 | FI | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | IT | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MK | 10.03.2021 | MT | 10.03.2021 | NL | 10.03.2021 | PL | 10.03.2021 | RO | 10.03.2021 | RS | 10.03.2021 | SE | 10.03.2021 | SI | 10.03.2021 | SK | 10.03.2021 | SM | 10.03.2021 | TR | 10.03.2021 | IE | 18.04.2021 | LU | 18.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | BG | 10.06.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | GR | 11.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | PT | 12.07.2021 | GB | 18.04.2022 | AT | 18.04.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/35] | HU | 18.04.2018 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
TR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2022 | ||
AT | 18.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 18.04.2018 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
TR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 18.04.2018 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 18.04.2018 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
GB | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 18.04.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | CZ | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 18.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | CZ | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | CZ | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1084816 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * par.10,21,31 & Anspruch 4 - Grundkörper 2 und Verstärkungselement 2 sind gemeinsam verklebt; paragraphs [0007] - [0032]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1387789 (L & L PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2008296164 (DAJEK ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * vgl. Fig.3 u. Fig.2 A-A & Fig.2 B-B - pos.d (Träger),g,i (Einsatzelement) & par.40 & par.17,18,21; paragraphs [0011] - [0067]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]JP2010036696 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-15 * Fig.7 & par.20 - pos.18 harz/resin & pos.20 schaum/foam; paragraphs [0003] - [0035]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US6387470 | US2009085379 | US2014237941 | Opposition | EP1084816 | US6247287 | US6471285 | EP1387789 | US6729425 | WO2008014250 | US2008296164 | US2009108626 | EP2154052 | JP2010036696 | US2010092733 | WO2010054194 | US2011049323 | US8011721 | US2012141724 | US2012207986 | WO2013082238 | WO2015054836 | WO2015061291 | CN106542002 |