EP3601245 - SMALL MOLECULE DCN1 INHIBITORS AND THERAPEUTIC METHODS USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of The University of Michigan Office of Technology Transfer 1600 Huron Parkway, 2nd Floor Ann Arbor, MI 48109-2590 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Shaomeng 3336 Stirling Court Superior Township, MI 48198 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Haibin 2304 Arrowwood Trail Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | 03 /
LU, Jianfeng 4982 S. Ridgeside Circle Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | 04 /
LIU, Liu 2358 Spring Ridge Court Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US | 05 /
SUN, Yi 3203 Creston Circle Superior Township, MI 48198 / US | 06 /
BERNARD, Denzil 250 King St. Unit 450 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2020/14] |
Former [2020/08] | 01 /
WANG, Shaomeng 3336 Stirling Court Superior Township, MI 48198 / US | ||
02 /
ZHOU, Haibin 2304 Arrowwood Trail Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | |||
03 /
LU, Jianfeng 4982 S. Ridgeside Circle Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | |||
04 /
LIU, Liu 2358 Spring Ridge Court Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US | |||
05 /
SUN, Yi 3203 Creston Circle Superior Township, MI 48198 / US | |||
06 /
BERNARD, Denzil 1803 Pointe Crossing Street Apartment 101 Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | |||
Former [2020/06] | 01 /
WANG, Shaomeng 3336 Stirling Court Superior Township, MI 48198 / US | ||
02 /
ZHOU, Haibin 2361 Arrowwood Trail Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | |||
03 /
LU, Jianfeng 2600 Arrowwood Trail Ann Arbor, MI 48109 / US | |||
04 /
LIU, Liu 2358 Spring Ridge Court Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US | |||
05 /
SUN, Yi 4424B MS-1 1301 Catherine Street Ann Arbor, MI 48109 / US | |||
06 /
BERNARD, Denzil 1803 Pointe Crossing Street Apartment 101 Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | Representative(s) | Schlich, George, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18718067.4 | 28.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US24708 | Priority number, date | US201762477498P | 28.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762477498 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018183411 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3601245 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/68, C07D333/20, C07D417/12, C07D417/14, C07D471/04, C07D471/08, C07D277/28, C07D277/64, A61P11/00, A61P3/00, A61P9/00, A61P25/28, A61P29/00, A61K31/426, A61K31/428 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
C07D277/64 (EP,US);
C07K5/1021 (US);
A61K31/426 (US);
A61K31/427 (US);
A61K31/428 (US);
A61K31/454 (US);
A61K31/5377 (US);
A61K38/05 (US);
A61K38/06 (US);
A61K38/07 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07C237/22 (EP);
C07C271/22 (EP);
C07D211/58 (EP);
C07D213/56 (EP);
C07D215/12 (EP);
C07D217/14 (EP);
C07D217/22 (EP);
C07D233/64 (EP);
C07D235/16 (EP);
C07D249/04 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP);
C07D263/56 (EP);
C07D277/30 (EP,US);
C07D295/15 (EP);
C07D311/68 (EP);
C07D333/24 (EP);
C07D413/12 (EP);
C07D413/14 (EP);
C07D417/04 (EP);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP);
C07D471/08 (EP);
C07K5/02 (US);
C07K5/021 (US);
C07K5/06026 (US);
C07K5/06139 (US);
C07K5/0821 (US);
C07K5/1024 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | KLEINMOLEKÜLIGE DCN1-INHIBITOREN UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DAMIT | [2020/06] | English: | SMALL MOLECULE DCN1 INHIBITORS AND THERAPEUTIC METHODS USING THE SAME | [2020/06] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE DCN1 À PETITES MOLÉCULES ET PROCÉDÉS THÉRAPEUTIQUES LES UTILISANT | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 11.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0441191 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,9-12 * compounds in table 1 *; | [X]US5430022 (HEMMI KEIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9-11,16 * compound 93 in column 97-98 *; | [X]EP1584625 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,10 * example 7; claim 1 *; | [X]CN101544687 (INST PHARM & TOXICOLOGY AMMS [CN]) [X] 1,2,5,7,9-11 * tripeptides given on pages 15, 16, 18 and 19 *; | [X]WO2009130735 (BERNI CANANI ROBERTO [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,9,19,20 * compound 2 on page 19;; claims 8,11,15 *; | [X]WO2014029022 (SLASSI ABDELMALIK [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,19,20,24 * compounds XV(c), XVI(e), XVII(i.2), II(i.2), 9, 10;; claims 1,16 *; | [A]WO2017049295 (ST JUDE CHILDREN'S RES HOSPITAL [US], et al) [A] 1-33* compounds of the examples; page 258; claim 1 *; | [X] - JANECKA E A, "Reduced-size antagonists of LHRH active in vitro", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19950101), vol. 38, doi:10.1021/JM00015A014, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2922 - 2924, XP002125914 [X] 1,2,5,7-11 * dipeptide 31 in Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00015a014 | [X] - XIAO-FEI ZHU ET AL, "Hydrolysis of DNA by a Dipeptides Containing Histidine", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE RESEARCH AND THERAPEUTICS ; FORMERLY KNOWN AS LETTERS IN PEPTIDE SCIENCE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20100907), vol. 16, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S10989-010-9232-X, ISSN 1573-3904, pages 297 - 300, XP019858084 [X] 1-3 * compound 1 on page 298 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10989-010-9232-x | [X] - Iwao Ojima ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF OPTICALLY ACTIVE N-[(N-ACETYL)-f¿-AMINOACYL]-fÀ-AMINO ALCOHOLS BY HOMOGENEOUS AND HETEROGENEOUS ASYMMETRIC HYDROGENATIONS", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (19820101), pages 1335 - 1338, URL: http://www.journal.csj.jp/doi/pdf/10.1246/cl.1982.1335, XP055484221 [X] 1-3,7,9-13 * compounds 4a-c and 5a-c on page 1336 * | [X] - HORWELL D C ET AL, "Design and synthesis of a targeted set of aromatic amino acid derivatives for identification of new lead compounds", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970805), vol. 7, no. 15, doi:10.1016/S0960-894X(97)00346-6, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1957 - 1962, XP004136366 [X] 1-3,7,9,10,13 * compound 3 in Table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(97)00346-6 | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20110417), Database accession no. 1281062-79-0, XP002781997 [X] 1,4,7 * compound cas rn: 1281062-79-0 * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20080608), Database accession no. 1026406-22-3, XP002781998 [X] 1,2,4,7,9,10 * compound cas rn: 1026406-22-3 * | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1978:136939, XP002781999 [X] 1,2,5,8 * compound cas rn: 65736-01-8 * | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20080624), Database accession no. 1030373-38-6, XP002782000 [X] 1-3,9,10,13,14 * compound: 1030373-38-6 * | by applicant | - Z. MA et al., Tetrahedron: Asymmetry, (19970000), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 883 - 888 | - CIECHANOVER, A.; SCHWARTZ, A. L., "The ubiquitin-proteasome pathway: the complexity and myriad functions of proteins death", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 2727 - 2730 | - HERSHKO, A., "The ubiquitin system for protein degradation and some of its roles in the control of the cell division cycle", Cell Death and Differentiation, (20050000), vol. 12, pages 1191 - 1197 | - BEDFORD, L.; LOWE, J.; DICK, L. R.; MAYER, R. J.; BROWNELL, J. E., "Ubiquitin-like protein conjugation and the ubiquitin-proteasome system as drug targets", Nat. Rev. Drug Discov., (20110000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd3321, pages 29 - 46, XP055247933 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd3321 | - NALEPA, G.; ROLFE, M.; HARPER, J. W., "Drug discovery in the ubiquitin-proteasome system", Nat. Rev. Drug Discov., (20060000), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd2056, pages 596 - 613, XP008110584 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd2056 | - KANE, R. C.; BROSS, P. F.; FARRELL, A. T.; PAZDUR, R., "Velcade((R)): USFDA approval for the treatment of multiple myeloma progressing on prior therapy", Oncologist, (20030000), vol. 8, pages 508 - 513 | - KANE, R. C. et al., "Bortezomib for the treatment of mantle cell lymphoma", Clinical Cancer Research, (20070000), vol. 13, pages 5291 - 5294 | - MCCORMACK, P. L., "Carfilzomib: in relapsed, or relapsed and refractory, multiple myeloma", Drugs, (20120000), vol. 72, pages 2023 - 2032 | - PETROSKI, M. D.; DESHAIES, R. J., "Function and regulation of cullin-RING ubiquitin ligases", Nat Rev Mol Cell Biol, (20050000), vol. 6, pages 9 - 20 | - GONG, L. M.; YEH, E. T. H., "Identification of the activating and conjugating enzymes of the NEDD8 conjugation pathway", J. Biol. Chem., (19990000), vol. 274, pages 12036 - 12042 | - DESHAIES, R. J.; EMBERLEY, E. D.; SAHA, A., "Control of Cullin-Ring Ubiquitin Ligase Activity by Nedd8", Conjugation andDeconjugation of Ubiquitin Family Modifiers, (20100000), vol. 54, pages 41 - 56 | - BULATOV, E.; CIULLI, A., "Targeting Cullin-RING E3 ubiquitin ligases for drug discovery: structure, assembly and small-molecule modulation", Biochem, (20150000), vol. J467, pages 365 - 386 | - DUDA, D. M. et al., "Structural insights into NEDD8 activation of Cullin-RING ligases: Conformational control of conjugation", Cell, (20080000), vol. 134, pages 995 - 1006 | - SCOTT, D. C. et al., "A Dual E3 Mechanism for Rub 1 Ligation to Cdc53", Molecular Cell, (20100000), vol. 39, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2010.08.030, pages 784 - 796, XP055033282 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2010.08.030 | - SOUCY, T. A.; DICK, L. R.; SMITH, P. G.; MILHOLLEN, M. A.; BROWNELL, J. E., "The NEDD8 Conjugation Pathway and Its Relevance in Cancer Biology and Therapy", Genes Cancer, (20100000), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1177/1947601910382898, pages 708 - 716, XP055151062 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1947601910382898 | - WATSON, I. R.; IRWIN, M. S.; OHH, M., "NEDD8 Pathways in Cancer, Sine Quibus Non", Cancer Cell, (20110000), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ccr.2011.01.002, pages 168 - 176, XP028363263 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2011.01.002 | - ZHAO, Y. C.; & SUN, Y., "Cullin-RING Ligases as Attractive Anti-cancer Targets", Curr Pharm Design, (20130000), vol. 19, pages 3215 - 3225 | - ZHAO, Y. C.; MORGAN, M. A.; SUN, Y., "Targeting Neddylation Pathways to Inactivate Cullin-RING Ligases for Anticancer Therapy", AntioxidRedox Sign, (20140000), vol. 21, pages 2383 - 2400 | - SOUCY, T. A. et al., "An inhibitor of NEDD8-activating enzyme as a new approach to treat cancer", Nature, (20090000), vol. 458, pages 732 - U767 | - BROWNELL, J. E. et al., "Substrate-Assisted Inhibition of Ubiquitin-like Protein-Activating Enzymes: The NEDD8 E1 Inhibitor MLN4924 Forms a NEDD8-AMP Mimetic In Situ", Molecular Cell, (20100000), vol. 37, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2009.12.024, pages 102 - 111, XP055376930 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2009.12.024 | - SOUCY, T. A.; SMITH, P. G.; ROLFE, M., "Targeting NEDD8-Activated Cullin-RING Ligases for the Treatment of Cancer", Clinical Cancer Research, (20090000), vol. 15, pages 3912 - 3916 | - HUANG, D. T. et al., "A unique E1-E2 interaction required for optimal conjugation of the ubiquitin-like protein NEDD8", Nature Structural & Molecular Biology, (20040000), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nsmb826, pages 927 - 935, XP055033432 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nsmb826 | - SCOTT, D. C.; MONDA, J. K.; BENNETT, E. J.; HARPER, J. W.; SCHULMAN, B. A., "N-Terminal Acetylation Acts as an Avidity Enhancer Within an Interconnected Multiprotein Complex", Science, (20110000), vol. 334, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1209307, pages 674 - 678, XP055033393 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1209307 | - SCOTT, D. C. et al., "Structure of a RING E3 Trapped in Action Reveals Ligation Mechanism for the Ubiquitin-like Protein NEDD8", Cell, (20140000), vol. 157, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2014.04.037, pages 1671 - 1684, XP028874993 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2014.04.037 | - YANG, C. Y.; WANG, S. M., "Computational Analysis of Protein Hotspots", ACS Med. Chem. Lett., (20100000), vol. 1, pages 125 - 129 | - YANG, C. Y.; WANG, S. M., "Hydrophobic Binding Hot Spots of Bcl-xL Protein-Protein Interfaces by Cosolvent Molecular Dynamics Simulation", ACS Med. Chem. Lett., (20110000), vol. 2, pages 280 - 284 | - YANG, C. Y.; WANG, S. M., "Analysis of Flexibility and Hotspots in Bcl-xL and Mcl-1 Proteins for the Design of Selective Small-Molecule Inhibitors", ACS Med. Chem. Lett., (20120000), vol. 3, pages 308 - 312 | - MONDA, J. K. et al., "Structural Conservation of Distinctive N-terminal Acetylation-Dependent Interactions across a Family of Mammalian NEDD8 Ligation Enzymes", Structure, (20130000), vol. 21, pages 42 - 53 | - KEUSS, M. J. et al., "Characterization of the mammalian family of DCN-type NEDD8 E3 ligases", J Cell Sci, (20160000), vol. 129, pages 1441 - 1454 | - MOLINA, D. M. et al., "Monitoring Drug Target Engagement in Cells and Tissues Using the Cellular Thermal Shift Assay", Science, (20130000), vol. 341, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1233606, pages 84 - 87, XP055193751 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1233606 | - KIM, A. Y. et al., "SCCRO (DCUN1D1) Is an Essential Component of the E3 Complex for Neddylation", J. Biol. Chem., (20080000), vol. 283, pages 33211 - 33220 | - KURZ, T. et al., "Dcnl functions as a scaffold-type E3 ligase for cullin neddylation", Molecular Cell, (20080000), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2007.12.012, pages 23 - 35, XP055033471 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2007.12.012 | - KOBAYASHI, A. et al., "Oxidative stress sensor Keap1 functions as an adaptor for Cul3-based E3 ligase to regulate for proteasomal degradation of Nrf2", Molecular and Cellular Biology, (20040000), vol. 24, pages 7130 - 7139 | - CULLINAN, S. B.; GORDAN, J. D.; JIN, J. O.; HARPER, J. W.; DIEHL, J. A., "The Keapl-BTB protein is an adaptor that bridges Nrf2 to a Cul3-based E3 ligase: Oxidative stress sensing by a Cul3-Keapl ligase", Molecular and Cellular Biology, (20040000), vol. 24, pages 8477 - 8486 | - VENUGOPAL, R.; JAISWAL, A. K., "Nrf2 and Nrfl in association with Jun proteins regulate antioxidant response element-mediated expression and coordinated induction of genes encoding detoxifying enzymes", Oncogene, (19980000), vol. 17, pages 3145 - 3156 | - NISHITANI, H. et al., "Two E3 ubiquitin ligases, SCF-Skp2 and DDB1-Cul4, target human Cdtl for proteolysis", EMBO J25, (20060000), pages 1126 - 1136 | - GORRINI, C.; HARRIS, I. S.; MAK, T. W., "Modulation of oxidative stress as an anticancer strategy", Nat. Rev. Drug Discov., (20130000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd4002, pages 931 - 947, XP055203511 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd4002 | - MA, Q., "Role of Nrf2 in Oxidative Stress and Toxicity", Annu Rev Pharmacol, (20130000), vol. 53 | - BOMPREZZI, R., "Dimethyl fumarate in the treatment of relapsing-remitting multiple sclerosis: an overview", Ther AdvNeurolDiso, (20150000), vol. 8, pages 20 - 30 | - LIBY, K. T.; SPORN, M. B., "Synthetic Oleanane Triterpenoids: Multifunctional Drugs with a Broad Range of Applications for Prevention and Treatment of Chronic Disease", Pharmacol Rev, (20120000), vol. 64, pages 972 - 1003 | - DE ZEEUW, D. et al., "Bardoxolone Methyl in Type 2 Diabetes and Stage 4 Chronic Kidney Disease", New Engl J Med, (20130000), vol. 369, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1306033, pages 2492 - 2503, XP055462730 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1306033 | - BUENDIA, I. et al., "Nrf2-ARE pathway: An emerging target against oxidative stress and neuroinflammation in neurodegenerative diseases", Pharmacol Therapeut, (20160000), vol. 157, doi:doi:10.1016/j.pharmthera.2015.11.003, pages 84 - 104, XP029374572 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pharmthera.2015.11.003 | - GENSCHIK, P.; SUMARA, I.; LECHNER, E., "The emerging family of CULLIN 3-RING ubiquitin ligases (CRL3s): cellular functions and disease implications", EMBO J., (20130000), vol. 32, pages 2307 - 2320 | - ANDERICA-ROMERO, A. C.; GONZALEZ-HERRERA, I. G.; SANTAMARIA, A.; PEDRAZA-CHAVERRI, J., "Cullin 3 as a novel target in diverse pathologies", Redox Biology, (20130000), vol. 1, pages 366 - 372 | - CANNING, P.; BULLOCK, A. N., "New strategies to inhibit KEAP1 and the Cul3-based E3 ubiquitin ligases", Biochem Soc Trans, (20140000), vol. 42, pages 103 - 107 | - HAYES, J. D.; DINKOVA-KOSTOVA, A. T., "The Nrf2 regulatory network provides an interface between redox and intermediary metabolism", Trends Biochem. Sci, (20140000), vol. 39, pages 199 - 218 | - SUZUKI, T.; MOTOHASHI, H.; YAMAMOTO, M., "Toward clinical application of the Keapl-Nrf2 pathway", Trends in Pharmacological Sciences, (20130000), vol. 34, pages 340 - 346 | - SPORN, M. B.; LIBY, K. T., "NRF2 and cancer: the good, the bad and the importance of context", Nat. Rev. Cancer, (20120000), vol. 12, pages 564 - 571 | - WANG, J. M.; CIEPLAK, P.; KOLLMAN, P. A., "How well does a restrained electrostatic potential (RESP) model perform in calculating conformational energies of organic and biological molecules?", J. Comput. Chem., (20000000), vol. 21, pages 1049 - 1074 | - OTWINOWSKI, Z.; MINOR, W., "Processing of X-ray diffraction data collected in oscillation mode", Method Enzymol, (19970000), vol. 276, pages 307 - 326 | - VAGIN, A.; TEPLYAKOV, A., "Molecular replacement with MOLREP", Acta Crystallogr D, (20100000), vol. 66, pages 22 - 25 | - EMSLEY, P.; COWTAN, K., "Coot: model-building tools for molecular graphics", Acta Crystallogr D, (20040000), vol. 60, pages 2126 - 2132 | - BRICOGNE, G.; BLANC, E.; BRANDL, M.; FLENSBURG, C.; KELLER, P.; PACIOREK, W.; ROVERSI, P.; SHARFF, A.; SMART, O.; VONRHEIN, C., BUSTER v.2.11.2., (20110000), URL: http://www.globalphasing.com |