EP3774289 - METHOD AND ASSEMBLY FOR A CONTINUOUS OR SEMI-CONTINUOUS ADDITIVE MANUFACTURE OF COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.10.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEONARDS, Holger Radeberger Str. 154d 50968 Köln / DE | 02 /
HOFFMANN, Andreas Südstr. 47 52064 Aachen / DE | 03 /
GILLNER, Arnold Wiedevenn 25 52159 Roetgen / DE | 04 /
NOTTRODT, Oliver c/o Fraunhofer-Institut für Lasertechnik Steinbachstr. 15 52074 Aachen / DE | [2021/08] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
LEONARDS, Holger Radeberger Str. 154d 50968 Köln / DE | ||
02 /
HOFFMANN, Andreas Südstr. 47 52064 Aachen / DE | |||
03 /
GILLNER, Arnold Wiedevenn 25 52159 Roetgen / DE | |||
04 /
NOTTRODT, Oliver Lousbergstr. 51 52072 Aachen / DE | Representative(s) | Gagel, Roland Patentanwalt Dr. Roland Gagel Landsberger Strasse 480a 81241 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 18718401.5 | 05.04.2018 | [2021/07] | WO2018EP58705 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019192700 | Date: | 10.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3774289 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3774289 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/171, B29C64/124, B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B29C64/40, B29C64/357, B29C64/232 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
B29C64/171 (EP);
B29C64/124 (EP,US);
B29C64/393 (US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (US);
B29C64/232 (EP);
B29C64/35 (EP);
B29C64/40 (EP);
B29K2033/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN ODER QUASIKONTINUIERLICHEN GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG VON BAUTEILEN | [2021/07] | English: | METHOD AND ASSEMBLY FOR A CONTINUOUS OR SEMI-CONTINUOUS ADDITIVE MANUFACTURE OF COMPONENTS | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION ADDITIVE CONTINUE OU QUASI CONTINUE DE PIÈCES | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 28.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | ES | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | IT | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | NL | 08.06.2022 | PL | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SE | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | PT | 10.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
MC | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | CZ | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | CZ | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
PT | 10.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
NL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 08.06.2022 | |
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2012140658 (OBJET LTD [IL], et al) [AD] 1-21 * figure 1A * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0055] *; | [A]DE102013021891 (VOXELJET AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * figure 8 *; | [AD]WO2016008876 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [AD] 1-21 * figure 2 * * figure 7 * * figure 8 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 26 * * page 9, line 8 - line 29 * * page 18, line 12 - line 33 *; | [A]DE102016201824 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0022] *; | [A]US2017334140 (ANDERSSON BO-GÖRAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-21 * figure 7c * * figure 7d * * figure 8a * * figure 8b * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064] * | by applicant | EP2289462 | WO2012140658 | DE102012021284 | WO2016008876 |