EP3600101 - LOCATING ABLATED TISSUES USING ELECTRIC PROPERTIES TOMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSCHER, Ulrich High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KEUPP, Jochen High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
GRUELL, Holger High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
HEIJMAN, Edwin High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
YEO, Sin Yuin High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 18718575.6 | 16.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018EP56617 | Priority number, date | EP20170161821 | 20.03.2017 Original published format: EP 17161821 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018172195 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3600101 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3600101 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12, A61B5/055, A61N7/02, G01R33/48 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
A61B18/12 (EP,US);
A61B5/0036 (US);
A61B5/015 (EP,US);
A61B5/0522 (US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B5/6823 (EP);
A61B90/37 (US);
A61N7/02 (EP,US);
G01R33/44 (EP);
G01R33/4814 (EP,US);
G01R33/54 (US);
A61B18/04 (US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/00666 (US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00994 (EP,US);
A61B2090/374 (EP,US);
G01R33/4804 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | ORTUNG ABLATIERTER GEWEBE MITTELS ELEKTRISCHER MERKMALSTOMOGRAPHIE | [2020/06] | English: | LOCATING ABLATED TISSUES USING ELECTRIC PROPERTIES TOMOGRAPHY | [2020/06] | French: | LOCALISATION DE TISSUS ENLEVÉS À L'AIDE DE LA TOMOGRAPHIE DE PROPRIÉTÉS ÉLECTRIQUES | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 21.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2018 | AL | 17.06.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | IE | 16.03.2021 | LU | 16.03.2021 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 16.03.2018 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MK | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/41] | HU | 16.03.2018 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 16.03.2018 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
LU | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000300535 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) [A] 1-10,12-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0011] - [0021] *; | [A]EP2636368 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-10,12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0003] - [0 20] - [0022] - [0 76] - [0083] *; | [A]US2015051475 (LEUSSLER CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10,12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0010] - [0 30] - [0049] - [0 85] - [0095] *; | [A]WO2016116545 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-10,12-14 * abstract * * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 2 *; | [AD] - OH IN KWON ET AL, "Fast conductivity imaging in magnetic resonance electrical impedance tomography (MREIT) for RF ablation monitoring", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYPERTHERMIA, GB, (20141020), vol. 30, no. 7, doi:10.3109/02656736.2014.966337, ISSN 0265-6736, pages 447 - 455, XP055406098 [AD] 1-10,12-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/02656736.2014.966337 | by applicant | - KWON, OH IN et al., "Fast conductivity imaging in magnetic resonance electrical impedance tomography (MREIT) for RF ablation monitoring", International Journal of Hyperthermia, (20140000), vol. 30, no. 7, doi:doi:10.3109/02656736.2014.966337, pages 447 - 455, XP055406098 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/02656736.2014.966337 |