EP3601743 - INLET GUIDE VANE ASSEMBLY OF GAS TURBINE AND GAS TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yang No. 1700 Hongxin Road Minhang District Room 74-602 Shanghai / CN | 02 /
LV, Hong Yun Lane 2200, Yinchun Road Minhang District Room 701, Building 38 Shanghai / CN | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18719531.8 | 20.04.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018EP60142 | Priority number, date | CN201720478719U | 02.05.2017 Original published format: CN 201720478719 U | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018202441 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3601743 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3601743 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D17/16, F01D25/24 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F01D17/162 (EP,US);
F01D25/243 (EP);
F05D2220/32 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINLASSLEITSCHAUFELANORDNUNG EINER GASTURBINE UND GASTURBINE | [2020/06] | English: | INLET GUIDE VANE ASSEMBLY OF GAS TURBINE AND GAS TURBINE | [2020/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE AUBE DIRECTRICE D'ENTRÉE D'UNE TURBINE À GAZ ET TURBINE À GAZ | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 22.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2018 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | ES | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | GR | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | MT | 31.03.2021 | NL | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | TR | 31.03.2021 | IE | 20.04.2021 | LU | 20.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 20.04.2018 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
TR | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 20.04.2018 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
MK | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HU | 20.04.2018 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
GR | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 20.04.2018 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP1207272 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 11] - [0014]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2015003968 (MALINIAK DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1,6,8 * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0023] , [0024]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP3032037 (MTU AERO ENGINES AG [DE]) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0007] , [0018] - [0022]; figures 1,2 * |