EP3600258 - SUSTAINED RELEASE OLANZAPINE FORMULAITONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH Schlüsselstrasse 12 8645 Jona / CH | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Mark, Alan 11 Gomer Court Elkton, MD 21921 / US | 02 /
CLAASSEN-PUNT, Carine Hoefijzerlaan 3 3980 GK Bunnik / NL | 03 /
CHEN, Ling 14 Landon Way Exton, PA 19341 / US | 04 /
GERSHON, Ari, Andrew Nakkash Street 2 Apt. 16 4976001 Petach Tikva / IL | [2020/13] |
Former [2020/06] | 01 /
SMITH, Mark, Alan 11 Gomer Court Elkton, MD 21921 / US | ||
02 /
CLAASSEN-PUNT, Carine Vuurbloem 34 2317 LP Leiden / NL | |||
03 /
CHEN, Ling 14 Landon Way Exton, PA 19341 / US | |||
04 /
GERSHON, Ari, Andrew Nakkash Street 2 Apt. 16 4976001 Petach Tikva / IL | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18720354.2 | 20.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018IB00374 | Priority number, date | US201762473608P | 20.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762473608 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018172850 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3600258 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K47/34, A61K31/551 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/5513 (EP,US);
A61K9/146 (US);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/1647 (EP,US);
A61P25/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | OLANZAPINFORMULIERUNGEN MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG | [2020/06] | English: | SUSTAINED RELEASE OLANZAPINE FORMULAITONS | [2020/06] | French: | FORMULATIONS D'OLANZAPINE À LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 18.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6169084 (BUNNELL CHARLES ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1-58 * column 12, line 35 - line 48 * * examples 110-117 * * claim 7 *; | CN103417492 [ ] (SHANGHAI MODERN PHARMACEUTICAL ENGINEERING RES CT CO LTD) [ ] * paragraph [0050] * * figures 1,2 *; | [L]WO2017053346 (TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INT GMBH [CH], et al) [L] 1-58 * the whole document *; | [X] - LUAN H ET AL, "Biodegradable microsphere comprises olanzapine, release modifiers, and poly(lactic-co-glycolic) acid", WPI / 2017 CLARIVATE ANALYTICS,, (20141204), vol. 2014, no. 21, XP002764432 [X] 1-58 * abstract * | [X] - SUSAN D'SOUZA ET AL, "IVIVC from Long Acting Olanzapine Microspheres", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF BIOMATERIALS, (20140101), vol. 23, no. 12, doi:10.1155/2014/407065, ISSN 1687-8787, pages 1177 - 11, XP055321371 [X] 1-58 * point 2.5 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2014/407065 | by applicant | WO0191720 | WO2004052336 | WO2005002625 | WO2005048952 | WO2005070332 | WO2005087201 | WO2005115599 | WO2005117830 | WO2007041410 | WO2007139744 | WO2008008363 | WO2008104635 | WO2008117927 | WO2008130158 | WO2008153611 | WO2009068708 | WO2009091737 | WO2009148580 | WO2010018159 | WO2010040188 | WO2010075072 | WO2010105093 | WO2011042453 | WO2011080733 | WO2011083086 | WO2011151356 | WO2012019009 | WO2012080986 | WO2012090070 | WO2013036309 | WO2013063125 | WO2013112434 | US2014323517 | WO2014202214 | - HU et al., IJPSR, (20120000), vol. 3, no. 9, pages 2888 - 2896 | - HOFFMAN, Adv. Drug. Del. Rev., (20020000), vol. 54, pages 3 - 12 | - AL-TAHAMI et al., Recent Patents on Drug Del. & Formulation, (20070000), vol. 1, pages 65 - 71 | - DETKE, H.C. et al., BMC Psychiatry, (20100000), vol. 10, page 43 | - BUSHE et al., BMC Psychiatry, (20150000), vol. 15, page 65 |