EP3612989 - FLEXIBLE HARDWARE FOR HIGH THROUGHPUT VECTOR DEQUANTIZATION WITH DYNAMIC VECTOR LENGTH AND CODEBOOK SIZE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2020/09] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMBARDEKAR, Amol Ashok Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
TOMIC, Aleksandar Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
MCBRIDE, Chad Balling Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
PETRE, George Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
CEDOLA, Kent D. Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
WALL, Larry Marvin Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
BOBROV, Boris Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 18720863.2 | 06.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018US26358 | Priority number, date | US201762486432P | 17.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762486432 P | US201815881519 | 26.01.2018 Original published format: US201815881519 | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018194851 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612989 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3612989 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/06, G06F9/50 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
G06F13/28 (EP,IL,US);
G06F13/1673 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G06N3/04 (IL,RU,US);
G06N3/063 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F15/8007 (EP,CN,IL,US);
H03M7/3059 (EP,IL,US);
G06F1/3206 (EP,IL);
G06F1/324 (IL,US);
G06F1/3275 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F1/3287 (EP,IL);
G06F12/0207 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F12/0238 (US);
G06F12/08 (CN,IL,US);
G06F12/0862 (IL,US);
G06F12/10 (IL,US);
G06F13/1689 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F17/15 (IL,US);
G06F3/0604 (IL,US);
G06F3/0631 (IL,US);
G06F3/067 (IL,US);
G06F9/30087 (IL,US);
G06F9/3836 (CN,IL,US);
G06F9/3858 (EP);
G06F9/3887 (IL,US);
G06F9/46 (EP,IL,US);
G06F9/467 (EP,IL);
G06F9/4881 (EP,IL,US);
G06F9/5016 (EP,CN,IL);
G06F9/5033 (EP,IL);
G06F9/5061 (EP,IL);
G06F9/5077 (EP,IL);
G06N3/045 (EP,IL,US);
G06N3/0464 (CN);
G06N3/048 (CN);
G06N3/049 (EP,IL,US);
G06N3/0495 (KR);
G06N3/06 (IL,US);
G06N3/065 (IL,US);
G06N3/08 (CN,IL,US);
G06N3/10 (IL,US);
H03M7/3066 (EP,IL);
H03M7/3088 (RU);
H03M7/46 (IL,US);
H03M7/6005 (IL,US);
H03M7/6011 (IL,US);
H03M7/6058 (EP,IL);
H03M7/70 (IL,US);
H04L45/04 (IL,US);
H04L45/50 (IL,US);
H04L67/02 (IL,US);
H04L67/1001 (IL,US);
G06F2209/484 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F2209/485 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F2212/1016 (EP,IL);
G06F2212/6026 (EP,IL);
G06F2212/657 (IL,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE HARDWARE FÜR HOCHLEISTUNGSVEKTORDEQUANTISIERUNG MIT DYNAMISCHER VEKTORLÄNGE UND CODEBUCHGRÖSSE | [2020/09] | English: | FLEXIBLE HARDWARE FOR HIGH THROUGHPUT VECTOR DEQUANTIZATION WITH DYNAMIC VECTOR LENGTH AND CODEBOOK SIZE | [2020/09] | French: | MATÉRIEL FLEXIBLE POUR UNE DÉQUANTIFICATION VECTORIELLE À HAUT DÉBIT AYANT UNE LONGUEUR DE VECTEUR DYNAMIQUE ET UNE TAILLE DE LIVRE DE CODES | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 17.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2023 | 12.12.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2010257174 (MINUTI MATTHEW DINO [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014]; figure 2 *; | [I]EP3035249 (INTEL CORP [US]) [I] 1,8 * abstract ** paragraphs [0118] - [0120]; figures 34A,34B,35A,35B,36; claim 8 * |