EP3609562 - VASCULAR ACCESS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.09.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.08.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smiths Medical ASD, Inc. 6000 Nathan Lane North Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | [2021/28] |
Former [2020/08] | For all designated states Access Scientific, LLC 3910 Sorrento Valley Boulevard, Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIERMAN, Steven, F. c/o Access Scientific LLC 3910 Sorrento Valley Blvd. Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | KIPA AB P O Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 18721620.5 | 12.04.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018US27377 | Priority number, date | US201762485797P | 14.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762485797 P | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018191547 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609562 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/06, A61M25/00, A61M25/06, A61M29/00 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
A61M25/0097 (EP,US);
A61M39/02 (US);
A61M25/0606 (US);
A61M25/0662 (EP);
A61M25/09041 (US);
A61M29/00 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0681 (EP);
A61M2039/0258 (US);
A61M2039/0273 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | A61M25/00, A61M25/06, A61M29/00, A61M39/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Title | German: | GEFÄSSZUGANGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/08] | English: | VASCULAR ACCESS DEVICE | [2020/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACCÈS AU SYSTÈME VASCULAIRE | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 30.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2013204226 (KEYSER STEPHEN RICHARD [US]); | [A]US2014257042 (LENKER JAY [US], et al); | [XY]WO2016176065 (ACCESS SCIENT LLC [US]) | by applicant | US9566087 |