EP3625894 - MOBILE RADIO SYSTEM HAVING A BEAMFORMING NETWORK AND A MULTIPLE ANTENNA SYSTEM IN ORDER TO PRODUCE A BROADCAST BEAM, AND A CORRESPONDING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2020/25] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Ericsson AB 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states KATHREIN SE Anton-Kathrein-Straße 1-3 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINHAUSER, Karl-August Klobensteinerstrasse 32 81545 M nchen / DE | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Flach Bauer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Adlzreiterstraße 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | Flach Bauer Stahl Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Adlzreiterstraße 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 18721721.1 | 24.04.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018EP60422 | Priority number, date | DE201710110725 | 17.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017110725 | [2020/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018210535 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3625894 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0495, H04B7/06, H04B7/10 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H04B7/0495 (EP);
H01Q21/26 (EP);
H01Q25/001 (EP);
H01Q3/40 (EP);
H04B7/0617 (EP);
H04B7/10 (EP);
H01Q21/062 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | MOBILFUNKSYSTEM MIT EINEM BEAMFORMING-NETZWERK UND EINEM MEHRFACHANTENNENSYSTEM, UM EIN BROADCAST-BEAM ZU ERZEUGEN SOWIE EIN ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN HIERFÜR | [2020/13] | English: | MOBILE RADIO SYSTEM HAVING A BEAMFORMING NETWORK AND A MULTIPLE ANTENNA SYSTEM IN ORDER TO PRODUCE A BROADCAST BEAM, AND A CORRESPONDING METHOD THEREFOR | [2020/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RADIO MOBILE COMPRENANT UN RÉSEAU DE FORMATION DE FAISCEAU ET UN SYSTÈME MULTI-ANTENNES PRÉVU POUR GÉNÉRER UN FAISCEAU DE DIFFUSION ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 14.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/03] | 14.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0199240 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-7,9,14 * page 1 - page 9 * * figures 1, 3, 5A, 5B * [I] 8,10-13; | [A]US6356771 (DENT PAUL W [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 60 - line 65 * * column 4 - column 5 * * figures 2, 3, 4 * | by applicant | WO03047027 |