EP3602737 - SPLIT STATOR BODY FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moving Magnet Technologies ZAC La Fayette 1, rue Christiaan Huygens 25000 Besançon / FR | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRIEUX, Gaël Chemin des Bourdons 7 2533 Evilard / CH | 02 /
TONNELIER, Gilles 11 rue des Aubépines 25480 Ecole Valentin / FR | 03 /
MARCHAL, Pierre 10 rue Maria Montessori Résidence Le Clos Vesontio 25000 Besancon / FR | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18722104.9 | 29.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018FR50766 | Priority number, date | FR20170052821 | 31.03.2017 Original published format: FR 1752821 | FR20170057839 | 24.08.2017 Original published format: FR 1757839 | [2020/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018178576 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3602737 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/14, H02K3/493, H02K5/24 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
H02K1/148 (EP,KR,US);
H02K3/493 (EP,KR);
H02K5/24 (EP,KR);
H02K2201/18 (US);
H02K2213/03 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | GETEILTER STATORKÖRPER FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE | [2020/06] | English: | SPLIT STATOR BODY FOR AN ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2020/06] | French: | CORPS STATORIQUE DIVISÉ POUR UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 26.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2004021548 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [I] 1,5,6* page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]WO2014136145 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract * [I] 3-7,10,15,16; | [IA]US2015061453 (TANIGUCHI MAKOTO [JP]) [I] 1-8,12,15,16 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0043]; figures 3-6,8,11,13 * [A] 9; | [XAI]DE202016104603U (JOHNSON ELECTRIC SA [CH]) [X] 1,3,5-9,11,12,15,16 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0131]; figures 8a,9-14,30,38 * [A] 13,14 [I] 2,4 | by applicant | EP2182218 | US2013057105 |