EP3642489 - A COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANESHKHAH, Kasra c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 02 /
JOHNSON, Mark c/o Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Kent, Miranda Jacket, et al Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Mitchell, Joshua Westley, et al Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | Application number, filing date | 18722183.3 | 27.04.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018GB51135 | Priority number, date | GB20170009862 | 20.06.2017 Original published format: GB 201709862 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018234740 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3642489 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F04D25/06, F04D25/08, F04D29/58, H02K9/00 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
F04D25/082 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
A47L9/22 (GB,KR);
A47L9/2889 (GB,KR);
F04D25/026 (US);
F04D25/06 (EP,US);
F04D29/5806 (EP,CN,GB,KR,US);
F04D29/582 (EP,US);
F04D29/584 (KR,US);
H02K1/20 (CN,KR);
H02K11/30 (CN,KR);
H02K9/04 (CN);
H02K9/06 (EP,GB,KR,US);
F04D19/002 (US);
F04D25/0646 (US);
F04D29/266 (KR,US);
F04D29/522 (US);
F05D2240/14 (KR,US);
F05D2250/20 (KR);
F05D2250/51 (KR,US);
F05D2260/20 (US);
H02K1/148 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | VERDICHTER | [2020/18] | English: | A COMPRESSOR | [2020/18] | French: | COMPRESSEUR | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 15.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE3710622 (ZUBLER GERAETEBAU [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 * [I] 5-7; | [XI]WO9830790 (TURBODYNE SYS INC [US]) [X] 1,3,7 * page 3, lines 14-27 * * figure 2 * [I] 2,5,6; | [XI]EP2247838 (WAERTSILAE FINLAND OY [FI]) [X] 1,3,7 * paragraphs [0040] , [0 43] * * figure 3 * [I] 2,5,6; | [A]EP2733326 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0043] , [0 44] ** figure 1 *; | [XI]US2016298648 (GRAHAM GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7 * paragraphs [0063] - [0068] * * figure 9 * [I] 2,5,6 |