EP3612681 - MECHANICAL DRIVE CONTROL FOR LOADERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | 10.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clark Equipment Company 250 East Beaton Drive West Fargo, ND 58078-6000 / US | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSKE, Craig 130 Dolan Drive Lincoln ND 58504 / US | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 18723166.7 | 19.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018US28303 | Priority number, date | US201762487161P | 19.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762487161 P | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018195277 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612681 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/34, E02F9/08, E02F9/20 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
E02F3/3414 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/225 (KR,US);
B62D11/04 (KR,US);
E02F9/02 (KR,US);
E02F9/166 (KR,US);
E02F9/2004 (EP,US);
E02F9/226 (KR,US);
E02F9/2292 (KR,US);
F15B11/17 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHE ANTRIEBSSTEUERUNG FÜR LADER | [2020/09] | English: | MECHANICAL DRIVE CONTROL FOR LOADERS | [2020/09] | French: | COMMANDE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT MÉCANIQUE POUR CHARGEURS | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 18.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/02] | Divisional application(s) | EP21212272.5 / EP3995628 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3579986 (ABE KATSURO, et al); | [A]US3765500 (REEVES M); | [X]US4090411 (ALBRIGHT LARRY E, et al); | [X]US4169513 (BODINE DALE P [US], et al); | [A]US2004084924 (ALBRIGHT LARRY E [US], et al) |