EP3635645 - AN AGRICULTURAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Industrial Belgium NV Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYDENS, Joachim Veldegemsestraat 85 8210 Zedelgem / BE | 02 /
DEBBAUT, Thomas B.H. Ryckaertstraat 6 9932 Ronsele / BE | 03 /
VERHAEGHE, Didier Meenseweg 229 8900 Ieper / BE | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/16] | CNH Industrial IP Department Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 18723497.6 | 08.05.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018EP61901 | Priority number, date | BE20170005336 | 09.05.2017 Original published format: BE 201705336 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018206592 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3635645 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/04, G06Q50/02 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
G06Q10/047 (EP);
G05D1/0212 (US);
A01B69/008 (EP,US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G06Q50/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Title | German: | LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES SYSTEM | [2020/16] | English: | AN AGRICULTURAL SYSTEM | [2020/16] | French: | SYSTÈME AGRICOLE | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 09.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP1548531 (DEERE & CO [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0076] *; | [A]US2010036569 (HEL SEBASTIEN [FR], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2012112896 (CLAIR SCOTT D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0162] *; | [I]WO2012112205 (CNH AMERICA LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A]WO2014137533 (BROWN OWEN J JR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0055] * |