EP3622317 - TRANSMITTER OPTICS FOR A LIDAR SYSTEM, OPTICAL ARRANGEMENT FOR A LIDAR SYSTEM, LIDAR SYSTEM AND WORKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Hans-Jochen Pilsener Str. 10 70567 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
OSTRINSKY, Joern Alfred-Daeuble-Strasse 2 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2020/12] | Application number, filing date | 18723800.1 | 08.05.2018 | [2020/12] | WO2018EP61752 | Priority number, date | DE201710208052 | 12.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017208052 | [2020/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018206517 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3622317 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/481, G01S17/93 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
G01S7/4812 (EP,KR,US);
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
G01S17/89 (US);
G01S7/4814 (US);
G01S7/4817 (EP,KR,US);
G01S7/4818 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Title | German: | SENDEROPTIK FÜR EIN LIDAR-SYSTEM, OPTISCHE ANORDNUNG FÜR EIN LIDAR-SYSTEM, LIDAR-SYSTEM UND ARBEITSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/12] | English: | TRANSMITTER OPTICS FOR A LIDAR SYSTEM, OPTICAL ARRANGEMENT FOR A LIDAR SYSTEM, LIDAR SYSTEM AND WORKING DEVICE | [2020/12] | French: | OPTIQUE D'EMETTEUR CONÇU POUR UN SYSTÈME LIDAR, SYSTÈME OPTIQUE POUR UN SYSTÈME LIDAR, SYSTÈME LIDAR ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAVAIL | [2020/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 12.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1688761 (ZEISS CARL OPTRONICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0063] *; | [XY]US2009201486 (CRAMBLITT ROBERT MERRILL [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2; | [A]DE102009040990 (ZEISS CARL AG [DE]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0079] *; | [Y]US2012075422 (WANG CHUAN-WEI [TW], et al) [Y] 1-6,9,10 * paragraph [0038]; figures 3,6 *; | [Y]DE102013221506 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076]; figure 7 *; | [A]WO2015189024 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 3 * page 2, line 20 - line 24 * * page 4, line 9 - line 13 *; | [Y]DE102015217908 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-6,9,10 * paragraph [0025]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0011] * |