EP3619454 - USE OF A BURIED PIPE WITH LONGITUDINAL WALL DUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steinzeug-Keramo GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 17 50226 Frechen / DE | [2020/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHLE, Ulrich c/o Steinzeug-Keramo GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 17 50226 Frechen / DE | 02 /
FLICK, Karl-Heinz c/o Steinzeug-Keramo GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 17 50226 Frechen / DE | 03 /
GERGERT, Arthur Amlingstadter 35 96114 Hirscheid / DE | 04 /
LECHNER, Michael Bürgermeister-Jacob Str. 6 96269 Großheirath / DE | 05 /
NEUMANN, Uwe Morschstraße 44c 55129 Mainz-Hechtsheim / DE | 06 /
SCHÄFER, Matthias An den Teichen 7 96465 Neustadt Cgb. / DE | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 18724190.6 | 07.05.2018 | [2020/11] | WO2018EP61702 | Priority number, date | DE201710207587 | 05.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017207587 | [2020/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018202912 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3619454 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16L9/10, F16L9/18, F16L49/00, H02G9/06, E03F3/04 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
F16L9/18 (EP);
E03B7/02 (EP);
E03F3/04 (EP);
E03F3/043 (EP);
F16L49/00 (EP);
F16L9/10 (EP);
H02G9/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES ERDVERLEGTEN ROHRES MIT LONGITUDINALEN WANDKANÄLEN | [2020/11] | English: | USE OF A BURIED PIPE WITH LONGITUDINAL WALL DUCTS | [2020/11] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN TUBE ENTERRÉ COMPRENANT DES CANAUX DE PAROI LONGITUDINAUX | [2020/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 03.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/38] | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US353680 (DANIEL N. HURLBUT) [X] 1-4,6 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 79; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-12; | [XY]US417992 (JOHN DELL) [X] 1-4,6 * page 1, lines 10-59; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]DE1975545U (FETOK GMBH [CH]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4220880 (DEDERLE KLAUS [DE]) [Y] 8* lines 5-17 - page 7 *; | [Y]NL1018638C (NIJMEEGSE BETONINDUSTRIE DE HA [NL]) [Y] 9,12 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1887271 (STEINZEUG ABWASSERSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9-11 * paragraph [0021]; figure - *; | [Y]WO2012037374 (TYCO THERMAL CONTROLS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0020] - [0025]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2013270815 (BRUDO HAIM [IL], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0108] - [0120]; figures 6,7 *; | [Y] - Keramo Gmbh Steinzeug, "KERAMAT ORIGINAL-ZUBEHÖRPROGRAMM. QUALITÄT BIS INS DETAIL", (20151231), URL: https://www.sk-data.com/files/bro_z_d_2015_fin_rz_02.pdf, (20180612), XP055483403 [Y] 10,11 * the whole document * |