EP3616043 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING AN OBJECT IN VIRTUAL OR SEMI-VIRTUAL SPACE BASED ON A USER CHARACTERISTIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2020/10] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREZ, Carlos G. Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SRINIVASAN, Vidya Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
MARSHALL, Colton Brett Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
HANDA, Aniket Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
MARTINEZ MOLINA, Harold Anthony Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18724378.7 | 11.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018US26996 | Priority number, date | US201762489904P | 25.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762489904 P | US201715636321 | 28.06.2017 Original published format: US201715636321 | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018200201 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3616043 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481, G06T17/00 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
G06T19/20 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F3/04815 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
G06F3/0481 (CN);
A63F13/63 (EP,IL,US);
G06F16/122 (IL,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F3/012 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G06F3/04842 (IL,KR,US);
G06T15/20 (EP,IL,US);
G06T15/205 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
G06T17/00 (CN);
G06T19/006 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES OBJEKTS IN EINEM VIRTUELLEN ODER HALBVIRTUELLEN RAUM BASIEREND AUF EINER BENUTZEREIGENSCHAFT | [2020/10] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING AN OBJECT IN VIRTUAL OR SEMI-VIRTUAL SPACE BASED ON A USER CHARACTERISTIC | [2020/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR FOURNIR UN OBJET DANS UN ESPACE VIRTUEL OU SEMI-VIRTUEL SUR LA BASE D'UNE CARACTÉRISTIQUE D'UTILISATEUR | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 21.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.01.2023 | 17.01.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/23] | 02.02.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |