EP3625152 - MODULAR STORAGE SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ocado Innovation Limited 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBO, Lars Sverker Ture 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | 02 /
CLARKE, Paul Ocado Innovation Limited The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | 03 /
INGRAM-TEDD, Andrew John 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [2022/06] |
Former [2020/13] | 01 /
LINDBO, Lars, Sverker, Ture 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | ||
02 /
CLARKE, Paul Ocado Innovation Limited The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | |||
03 /
INGRAM-TEDD, Andrew, John 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | Representative(s) | Ocado Group IP Department The IP Department c/o Buildings One & Two Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9UL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | Ocado Group IP Department The Legal Department 1 Trident Place Mosquito Way Hatfield AL10 9UL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18724889.3 | 16.05.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018EP62785 | Priority number, date | GB20170007922 | 17.05.2017 Original published format: GB 201707922 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018210952 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3625152 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3625152 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/02, B65G1/04 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
B65G1/0464 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65G1/02 (EP,GB,US);
B61B3/00 (US);
B65D19/385 (US);
B65G1/0478 (KR,US);
B65D2501/24554 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR MODULARE AUFBEWAHRUNG | [2020/13] | English: | MODULAR STORAGE SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2020/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE STOCKAGE MODULAIRES | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 13.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21195203.1 / EP3939911 | EP24150600.5 / EP4324768 | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2018 | AL | 09.02.2022 | CY | 09.02.2022 | CZ | 09.02.2022 | DK | 09.02.2022 | EE | 09.02.2022 | FI | 09.02.2022 | HR | 09.02.2022 | LT | 09.02.2022 | LV | 09.02.2022 | MC | 09.02.2022 | MK | 09.02.2022 | MT | 09.02.2022 | RO | 09.02.2022 | RS | 09.02.2022 | SI | 09.02.2022 | SK | 09.02.2022 | SM | 09.02.2022 | TR | 09.02.2022 | BG | 09.05.2022 | GR | 10.05.2022 | GB | 16.05.2022 | IE | 16.05.2022 | LU | 16.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | IS | 09.06.2022 | PT | 09.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.05.2018 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
TR | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 16.05.2018 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
MK | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IE | 16.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 09.02.2022 | |
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 09.02.2022 | |
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | FI | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [AD]GB2520104 (OCADO INNOVATION LTD [GB]); | [A]WO2016172793 (ATTABOTICS INC [CA]) | Examination | GB2520104 | WO2016172793 |