EP3612081 - ANNOTATION HISTOGRAM FOR ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEWART, Brian 102 Lowell Road Apartment 204 North Reading, Massachusetts 01864 / US | 02 /
BUHARIN, Vasiliy E. 99 Egerton Road Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US | 03 /
PERLMAN, Mordechai 127 Fayerweather Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | 04 /
BENNETT, Nathan H. 21 Sparts Street Apartment 3 Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 18725050.1 | 17.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018US27927 | Priority number, date | US201762486920P | 18.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762486920 P | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018195052 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612081 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/00, A61B34/00, A61B34/20, A61B5/349, A61B5/339, A61B5/318, A61B5/00, A61B5/0245, A61B5/06, A61B5/0538, A61B18/14 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
A61B5/743 (EP,US);
A61B5/339 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B34/25 (EP,US);
A61B5/0245 (EP,US);
A61B5/318 (EP,US);
A61B5/349 (EP,US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F40/169 (US);
G06T11/206 (US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00839 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2562/04 (EP,US);
A61B2562/06 (EP,US);
A61B5/0538 (EP,US);
A61B5/063 (EP,US);
A61B5/287 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | A61B5/00, A61B5/0245, A61B5/0402, A61B5/042, A61B5/0452, A61B5/044, A61B5/053, A61B5/06, A61B18/14, A61B34/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | ANNOTATIONSHISTOGRAMM FÜR ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGISCHE SIGNALE | [2023/51] | English: | ANNOTATION HISTOGRAM FOR ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL SIGNALS | [2020/09] | French: | HISTOGRAMME D'ANNOTATION POUR SIGNAUX ÉLECTRO-PHYSIOLOGIQUES | [2023/51] |
Former [2020/09] | VERMERKSHISTOGRAMM FÜR ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGISCHE SIGNALE | ||
Former [2020/09] | HISTOGRAMME D'ANNOTATION POUR SIGNAUX ÉLECTROPHYSIOLOGIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 13.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2011206256 (RAMANATHAN CHARULATHA [US], et al); | [XI]WO2013123549 (ADELAIDE RES & INNOVATION PTY [AU]); | [XI]US2015366476 (LAUGHNER JACOB I [US], et al); | by applicant | US6070094 | US6233491 | US6735465 | US7515954 | US8428700 | US8615287 | US8948837 | US2015065836 | US20080437794 |