EP3612844 - DEVICE FOR PACKAGING BALLS FOR REACTION VESSELS FOR AN ANALYSIS APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diagnostica Stago 3 Allée Theresa 92600 Asnières-sur- Seine / FR | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROSSARD, Matthieu 29 rue Raymond QUENEAU 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2020/14] |
Former [2020/09] | 01 /
BROSSARD, Matthieu 5 rue Nadar 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Representative(s) | Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. C/o Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS 92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. c/o Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2020/09] | Robert, Mathias, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18725268.9 | 10.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018FR50898 | Priority number, date | FR20170053414 | 20.04.2017 Original published format: FR 1753414 | [2020/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018193184 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612844 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3612844 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00, B65D83/04 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
G01N35/00 (EP,KR,US);
B65D83/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B01L3/523 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2200/026 (EP,KR);
B01L2200/0647 (EP,KR);
B01L2300/046 (US);
B01L2300/049 (EP,KR);
B01L2300/0832 (US);
B01L2300/123 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERPACKEN VON KUGELN FÜR REAKTIONSGEFÄSSE FÜR EIN ANALYSEGERÄT | [2020/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR PACKAGING BALLS FOR REACTION VESSELS FOR AN ANALYSIS APPLIANCE | [2020/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE BILLES POUR CUVETTES DE RÉACTION DESTINÉES À UN APPAREIL D'ANALYSE | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 16.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.08.2022 | AT | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | IE | 10.04.2023 | LU | 10.04.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4101284 (DIFIGLIO JOSEPH J, et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 4-6 * [Y] 12,13; | [XY]US4150766 (KNORR ROBERT H [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 6-7 * [Y] 12,13; | [XY]US4405060 (HSEI PAUL K [US]) [X] 1-11 * figures 4, 5 * [Y] 12,13; | [AD]US4918984 (MARTINOLI JEAN-LUC [FR], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5014877 (ROOS WILLIAM N [US]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-3 * [Y] 12,13; | [XY]US5336469 (TOBIKI HISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 4, 5 * [Y] 12,13; | [AD]US2005175502 (ROUSSEAU ALAIN [FR], et al) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]US2006012130 (VANN CHARLES S [US], et al) [Y] 12,13 * figures 3, 5 *; | [XY]US2006275178 (CHANG RONALD [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 12,13; | [XY]US2008011773 (TOBIAS JACQUILINE HAZEL [AU]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13; | [XY]US2014171344 (BUNCE ADRIAN [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0138] - [0139]; figure 2 * [Y] 12,13 | by applicant | EP0325874 | WO03065047 |