EP3625860 - CABLE BUSHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states icotek project GmbH & Co. KG Bischof-von-Lipp-Str. 5 73569 Eschach / DE | [2020/25] |
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states icotek project GmbH & Co. KG Nelkenstrasse 12 73563 Mögglingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHMANN, Bruno Nelkenstr. 12 73563 M gglingen / DE | 02 /
EHMANN, Valentin Sebaldstra e 25 73525 Schw bisch Gm nd / DE | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18725810.8 | 16.05.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018EP62642 | Priority number, date | DE201710208477 | 19.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017208477 | [2020/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018210892 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3625860 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/08, H02G3/22 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H02G3/22 (EP,US);
H02G15/007 (EP,US);
H02G15/013 (US);
H02G3/0683 (EP);
H02G3/083 (EP,US);
H02G3/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | KABELDURCHFÜHRUNG | [2020/13] | English: | CABLE BUSHING | [2020/13] | French: | PASSAGE DE CÂBLE | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 07.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010001476 (BROEDER JAN [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0005] , [0023] , [0024]; figures 4,6,9,11,12 *; | [A]EP2746634 (ICOTEK PROJECT GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1* figures 1,2,3a,6 *; | [Y]US2015083486 (HILL RAYMOND M [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020]; figures 3,4 * | by applicant | DE10143296 | DE10347653 |