EP3638906 - MULTISTAGE ROOTS PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/17] | MULTI-STAGE ROTARY PISTON PUMP | ||
[2021/43] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leybold GmbH Bonner Strasse 498 50968 Köln / DE | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREIFERT, Thomas Falkenweg 5 50171 Kerpen / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Roland Zitronenfalterstrasse 12 50999 Köln / DE | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 18726990.7 | 23.05.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018EP63572 | Priority number, date | DE20172003212U | 17.06.2017 Original published format: DE 202017003212 U | [2020/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018228784 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3638906 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F04C28/16, F04C23/00, F04C29/04, F04C25/02, F04C18/12, F04C28/26 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
F04C18/126 (EP,KR);
F04C25/02 (EP,KR,US);
F04C23/001 (EP,KR);
F04C28/16 (EP,KR);
F04C29/04 (EP,KR,US);
F04C18/165 (US);
F04C2220/10 (US);
F04C2240/30 (US);
F04C2270/19 (EP,KR,US);
F05C2201/021 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/17] | F04C23/00, F04C28/26, F04C18/12, F04C25/02, F04C29/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFIGE WÄLZKOLBENPUMPE | [2020/17] | English: | MULTISTAGE ROOTS PUMP | [2021/43] | French: | POMPE À LOBES MULTI-ÉTAGÉE | [2021/43] |
Former [2020/17] | MULTI-STAGE ROTARY PISTON PUMP | ||
Former [2020/17] | POMPE ROOTS À ÉTAGES MULTIPLES | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 13.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/17] | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IAY]WO2004083643 (EBARA CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-3,7-10,12 * page 12, line 9 - page 13, line 10 * * page 14, line 12 - page 17, line 1 * * figures 3-6,8,10 * [A] 11 [Y] 4-6; | [A]US2004247465 (YOSHIMURA MASASHI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] ** figure 1 *; | [YA]EP2549112 (ADIXEN VACUUM PRODUCTS [FR]) [Y] 4-6 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 1,3,4 * [A] 1-3,7-12; | [A]EP2767717 (ADIXEN VACUUM PRODUCTS [FR]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0040] , [0041] , [0047] - [0049] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026]; figure - * |