EP3630637 - CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
DE
GB
IE
IT
MT
Unilever Global IP Limited Port Sunlight Wirral, Merseyside CH62 4ZD / GB | [2022/08] |
Former [2021/39] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
DE
GB
IE
IT
MT
Unilever Global IP Limited Port Sunlight Wirral, CH62 AZD / GB | |||
Former [2020/15] | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CESARE, Slavica Conopco Inc. d/b/a UNILEVER 45 Commerce Drive Trumbull Connecticut 06611 / US | 02 /
LALIER, Gregory Conopco Inc. d/b/a UNILEVER 45 Commerce Drive Trumbull Connecticut 06611 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus, et al Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18728145.6 | 30.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018EP64188 | Priority number, date | US201715611781 | 01.06.2017 Original published format: US201715611781 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018220013 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3630637 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/04, B65D47/08 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
B65D41/17 (EP,EA,US);
B65D47/0804 (CN);
B65D41/0471 (EP,EA,US);
B65D41/0485 (CN);
B65D41/34 (EA,US);
B65D47/08 (EP,EA,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSS | [2020/15] | English: | CLOSURE | [2020/15] | French: | BOUCHON | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 31.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5681049U ; | [A]JPS5943348U ; | [A]WO02081316 (ALPLA WERKE [AT], et al); | [AD]US8365933 (JAECKEL GERHARD F K [DE]); | [A]EP2921232 (EMD MILLIPORE CORP [US]); | [XP]WO2017108697 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) | by applicant | US8365933 |