EP3635441 - A METHOD FOR ACQUIRING A SEISMIC DATASET OVER A REGION OF INTEREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TotalEnergies OneTech La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states TOTAL SE La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states Total SA 2 place Jean Millier La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOELLE, Jean-Luc c/o TOTAL SA, CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau Cedex / FR | 02 /
MASONI, Isabella TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau Cedex / FR | 03 /
ESTIVAL, Rémi TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau Cedex / FR | 04 /
BARBOUTEAU, Sandra TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau Cedex / FR | [2020/17] |
Former [2020/16] | 01 /
BOELLE, Jean-Luc TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau Cedex / FR | ||
02 /
MASONI, Isabella TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau Cedex / FR | |||
03 /
ESTIVAL, Rémi TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau Cedex / FR | |||
04 /
BARBOUTEAU, Sandra TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau Cedex / FR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18728183.7 | 07.06.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018EP64989 | Priority number, date | EP20170305684 | 08.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17305684 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018224585 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3635441 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3635441 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/00, // G01V1/04, G01V1/16 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
G01V1/001 (EP,RU,US);
G01V1/003 (EP,RU,US);
G01V1/04 (EP,RU);
G01V1/104 (US);
G01V1/168 (EP,RU);
G01V1/181 (US);
G01V1/223 (US);
G01V3/08 (US);
G08B13/1609 (RU);
G08B13/1663 (RU);
G01V2200/14 (EP);
G01V2210/121 (EP);
G01V2210/1212 (US);
G01V2210/1236 (EP);
G01V2210/1295 (EP);
G01V2210/1425 (EP);
G01V2210/144 (US);
G01V2210/169 (EP);
G01V2210/72 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/16] | G01V1/00, G01V1/16, G01V1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG EINES SEISMISCHEN DATENSATZES ÜBER EINE REGION VON INTERESSE | [2020/16] | English: | A METHOD FOR ACQUIRING A SEISMIC DATASET OVER A REGION OF INTEREST | [2020/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION D'UN ENSEMBLE DE DONNÉES SISMIQUES SUR UNE RÉGION D'INTÉRÊT | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 13.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US7377357 (DUREN RICHARD E [US], et al); | [XAI]US2013265851 (FABER KEES [NL], et al); | [XA]US2014027122 (MEIER MARK A [US], et al); | [XAI]US2015309195 (SALLAS JOHN J [US]) |