EP3635442 - METHOD FOR ACQUIRING A SEISMIC DATASET OVER A REGION OF INTEREST AND RELATED SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TotalEnergies OneTech La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/41] | For all designated states TOTAL SE La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states Total SA 2 place Jean Millier La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADLER, Frank TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau / FR | 02 /
BOELLE, Jean-Luc TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau Cedex / FR | 03 /
PUNTOUS, Henri TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau / FR | 04 /
MASONI, Isabella TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau Cedex / FR | 05 /
XIE, Peigen TOTAL SA CSTJF EB237 Avenue Larribau 64018 Pau / FR | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18728196.9 | 07.06.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018EP65067 | Priority number, date | EP20170305683 | 08.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17305683 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018224607 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3635442 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/00 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
G01V1/003 (EP,RU,US);
G01V1/282 (RU);
G01V1/30 (RU);
G01V1/345 (US);
G01V2210/1295 (US);
G01V2210/1425 (US);
G01V2210/16 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG EINES SEISMISCHEN DATENSATZES ÜBER EINE BESTIMMTE REGION UND DIESBEZÜGLICHES SYSTEM | [2020/16] | English: | METHOD FOR ACQUIRING A SEISMIC DATASET OVER A REGION OF INTEREST AND RELATED SYSTEM | [2020/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION D'UN ENSEMBLE DE DONNÉES SISMIQUES SUR UNE ZONE D'INTÉRÊT ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉ | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 12.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/21] | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004230379 (HOUCK RICHARD T [US]) [A] 1-19* claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2012162433 (ION GEOPHYSICAL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 2,10,15,17 * paragraphs [0018] , [0022] , [0 34] , [0 52] *; | [Y]US2014078865 (COSTE EMMANUEL [US], et al) [Y] 12,13,16,19 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0039] , [0041] , [0043] *; | [XYI]US2017059727 (EICK PETER M [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,11,14,18 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0009] , [0014] , [0028] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0083]; claim 1 * [Y] 2,10,12,13,15-17,19 [I] 7-9 | by applicant | - E. BAYSAL; D. KOSLOFF; J.W.C. SHERWOOD, "Reverse time migration", Geophysics, (19830000), vol. 48, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1190/1.1441434, pages 1514 - 1524, XP008121684 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1190/1.1441434 | - W.F. CHANG; G.A. MCMECHAN, "Elastic reverse Time Migration", geophysics, (19870000), vol. 52, no. 10, pages 1365 - 1375 | WO2016EP57136 |