EP3621851 - A CONSTRUCTION MACHINE HAVING AN ASCENT MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 510 Lake Cook Road Suite 100 Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [2020/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRNDOBLER, Markus Buchenweg 3 92439 Bodenwöhr / DE | 02 /
FRANK, Fabien Bergstrasse 41 92263 Ebermannsdorf / DE | 03 /
Bauer, Bernhard 92442 Wackersdorf / DE | [2024/01] |
Former [2020/12] | 01 /
HERRNDOBLER, Markus Buchenweg 3 92439 Bodenwöhr / DE | ||
02 /
FRANK, Fabien Bergstrasse 41 92263 Ebermannsdorf / DE | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2024/04] |
Former [2020/12] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 18728496.3 | 11.05.2018 | [2020/12] | WO2018US32397 | Priority number, date | DE20171004545 | 12.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017004545 | [2020/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018209284 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3621851 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3621851 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60R3/02, E02F9/08 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
B60R3/02 (EP);
E02F9/0833 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUMASCHINE MIT AUFSTIEGSMITTEL | [2020/12] | English: | A CONSTRUCTION MACHINE HAVING AN ASCENT MEANS | [2020/12] | French: | ENGIN DE CHANTIER COMPRENANT UN MOYEN DE MONTÉE | [2020/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 28.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
LV | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
PL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
PT | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2053811 (KOCKUM LANDSVERK AB) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US6817433 (BERGSTROM AAKE [SE], et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 2-3 *; | [I]US7354050 (BROCKWAY ROBERT JOHN [US]) [I] 1-7,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2481275 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-9* figures 1-4 * | Examination | US6264222 | WO2017022336 |