EP3629847 - A VALVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mayborn (UK) Limited Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 8EW / GB | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUDWORTH, Nicholas Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 8EW / GB | 02 /
SANDERS, Anthony Jonathan Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 8EW / GB | 03 /
PARKER, Richard Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 8EW / GB | 04 /
ANGUS, Peter Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 8EW / GB | 05 /
O'BRIEN, Matthew Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 8EW / GB | 06 /
CRULLEY, Kevin Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 8EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | 01 /
CUDWORTH, Nicholas Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 8EW / GB | ||
02 /
SANDERS, Anthony Jonathan Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 8EW / GB | |||
03 /
PARKER, Richard Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 8EW / GB | |||
04 /
ANGUS, Peter Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 8EW / GB | |||
05 /
O'BRIEN, Matthew Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 8EW / GB | |||
06 /
CRULLEY, Kevin Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 8EW / GB | Representative(s) | Bloor, Sam Mayborn (UK) Limited Mayborn House Balliol Business Park Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 8EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | HGF Limited 3rd Floor Central Square South Orchard Street Newcastle Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 3AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18728709.9 | 23.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018GB51403 | Priority number, date | GB20170008239 | 23.05.2017 Original published format: GB 201708239 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018215769 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3629847 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47G19/22 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
A47G19/2272 (EP,GB,US);
F16K7/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | VENTILANORDNUNG | [2020/15] | English: | A VALVE ASSEMBLY | [2020/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE CLAPET | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 08.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB2401857 (MILLER AUSTEN CHARLES [GB]); | [XI]WO2012007731 (OZ10 LTD [GB], et al); | [XI]GB2482294 (LTG DESIGNS LTD [GB]); | [XDI]US8453870 (BERG GUNNAR [NO]); | [XI]US2015102032 (DUNN STEVEN BRYAN [US], et al); | [XI]FR3025411 (VISIOMED GROUP [FR]) |