EP3615162 - CHEMICAL RECOVERY BY DISTILLATION OF DILUTE AQUEOUS SOLUTIONS PRODUCED IN ADVANCED BIO-FUELS PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermal Kinetics Systems, LLC 85 Northpointe Parkway Suite 2 Amherst, NY 14228 / US | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Christopher, J. 64 Mount Vernon Road Amherst, NY 14226 / US | 02 /
CROMWELL, Charles, C. 682 East&West Road West Seneca, NY 14224 / US | 03 /
SPENGLER, Christopher, A. 221 Highland Drive Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18728786.7 | 26.03.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018US24307 | Priority number, date | US201762481983P | 05.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762481983 P | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018187073 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3615162 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D1/14, B01D1/28, B01D3/32, B01D35/12, B01D3/38, B01D3/00, B01D3/14, C07C29/80 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
B01D3/146 (EP,US);
B01D1/2856 (EP,US);
B01D3/002 (EP,US);
B01D3/143 (EP,US);
B01D3/322 (EP,US);
B01D3/38 (EP);
B01D53/261 (US);
C07C29/80 (EP,US);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/80, C07C31/04 (US,EP);
C07C29/80, C07C31/08 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2020/10] | B01D1/14, B01D1/28, B01D3/32, B01D3/40, B01D3/42, B01D5/00, B01D35/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | CHEMISCHE RÜCKGEWINNUNG DURCH DESTILLATION VON VERDÜNNTEN WÄSSRIGEN LÖSUNGEN, DIE IN FORTSCHRITTLICHEN BIOKRAFTSTOFFPROZESSEN HERGESTELLT WERDEN | [2020/10] | English: | CHEMICAL RECOVERY BY DISTILLATION OF DILUTE AQUEOUS SOLUTIONS PRODUCED IN ADVANCED BIO-FUELS PROCESSES | [2020/10] | French: | RÉCUPÉRATION CHIMIQUE PAR DISTILATION DE SOLUTIONS AQUEUSES DILUÉES PRODUITES DANS DES PROCÉDÉS AVANCÉS DE BIO-CARBURANTS | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2018 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 20.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4566947 (TSURUTA HIDEMASA [JP]) [A] 1-25 * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US5124004 (GRETHLEIN HANS E [US], et al) [A] 1-25* figure 5a *; | [A]WO2011103277 (ALGENOL BIOFUELS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * figure 4 *; | [XI]US2012137727 (HUANG YU [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-10,25 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 65] , [ 126] - [0133] * [I] 4-6,11-24; | [A]US2013015052 (VANE LELAND M [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * figures 5-22 *; | [A]US2013175158 (KIUCHI TAKAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-25 * figures 3, 4 * | International search | [A]US4539076 (SWAIN R L BIBB [US]) [A] 1-27* , col 3, In 66 to col 4, In 20; col 4, In 49-64; col 5, In 42-68; col 6, In 13-61 *; | [A]US2009120780 (WEGERER DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * , para [00030]-[0033], [0053], [0055] *; | [A]US2014179957 (POWELL NATHAN KIRK [US]) [A] 1-27 * , para [0024], [0026], [0028], [0031], [0147] *; | [A]US2017036139 (LEE JOO SUN [KR]) [A] 1-27 * , para [0055]-[0058], [0067], [0074] *; | [A]WO2017053342 (VEOLIA WATER TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-27 * , pg 2, In 23 to pg 3, In 18 * | by applicant | US2012137727 |