EP3641570 - SUGAR COATING METHOD AND SUGAR COATED SOLID FORMS WITH IRREGULAR SHAPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roquette Frères 1 rue de la Haute Loge 62136 Lestrem / FR | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEFEVRE, Philippe 3600 rue de Merville 59660 Haverskerque / FR | 02 /
LE BIHAN, Grégory 1 rue du Lieutenant Grébaut 62232 Annezin / FR | 03 /
CROQUET, Sébastien 124 route de la Gorgue 59660 Merville / FR | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18730375.5 | 18.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018EP66134 | Priority number, date | FR20170055557 | 19.06.2017 Original published format: FR 1755557 | [2020/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018234248 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3641570 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A23P20/10, A23G3/34, A23G3/54, A23P20/18 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
A23P20/10 (EP);
A61K9/2826 (CN);
A23G3/54 (EP,CN,US);
A23G3/0089 (EP,US);
A23G3/0095 (EP,US);
A23G3/343 (CN);
A23L29/37 (US);
A23P20/18 (EP,CN,US);
A61K9/2018 (US);
A23V2002/00 (CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/6422, A23V2250/6402, A23V2250/6418, A23V2250/61 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | ZUCKERBESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUCKERBESCHICHTETE FESTE FORMEN MIT UNREGELMÄSSIGEN FORMEN | [2020/18] | English: | SUGAR COATING METHOD AND SUGAR COATED SOLID FORMS WITH IRREGULAR SHAPES | [2020/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE DRAGEIFICATION ET FORMES SOLIDES DRAGEIFIEES PRESENTANT DES FORMES IRREGULIERES | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 13.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0111984 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [A]WO0170195 (MARS INC [US]); | [Y]WO02076227 (DANDY AS [DK], et al); | [Y]FR2826239 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]); | [XDA]US2008026131 (BENJAMIN SUSAN M [US], et al); | [XY]DE102008001104 (LOEDIGE MASCHBAU GMBH GEB [DE]) | by applicant | US2008026131 |