EP3641863 - DOSING SYSTEM FOR AN INHALATION DEVICE, INHALATION DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR DOSING LIQUID TO AN INHALATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/18] | DOSING SYSTEM FOR A NEBULIZER | ||
[2020/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vectura Delivery Devices Limited One Prospect West Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODWIN, Paul c/o Vectura Delivery Devices Limited 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | 02 /
MELINIOTIS, Andreas Mark c/o Vectura Delivery Devices Limited 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | 03 /
CLARKE, Roger William c/o Vectura Delivery Devices Limited 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | 04 /
KOLB, Tobias c/o Vectura Delivery Devices Limited 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | [2021/03] |
Former [2020/18] | 01 /
GOODWIN, Paul c/o Vectura Delivery Devices Limited 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | ||
02 /
MELINIOTIS, Andreas Mark c/o Vectura Delivery Devices Limited 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | |||
03 /
CLARKE, Roger William c/o Vectura Delivery Devices Limited 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | |||
04 /
KOLB, Tobias c/o Vectura GmbH Robert-Koch-Allee 29 82131 Gauting / DE | Representative(s) | Clarke, Christopher John Vectura Limited 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0GZ / GB | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18731103.0 | 19.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018EP66296 | Priority number, date | EP20170177225 | 21.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17177225 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018234324 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3641863 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3641863 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, // A61M11/00 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
A61M15/0028 (EP);
A61M15/0065 (EP,US);
A61M15/0085 (EP,US);
A61M11/005 (EP);
A61M2202/0468 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0468, A61M2202/0007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/18] | A61M15/00, A61M11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOSIERSYSTEM FÜR EINE INHALATIONSVORRICHTUNG, INHALATIONSVORRICHTUNG, UND VERFAHREN ZUR DOSIERUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEIT ZU EINER INHALATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/45] | English: | DOSING SYSTEM FOR AN INHALATION DEVICE, INHALATION DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR DOSING LIQUID TO AN INHALATION DEVICE | [2020/45] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DOSAGE POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'INHALATION, DISPOSITIF D'INHALATION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE DOSAGE D'UN LIQUIDE À UN DISPOSITIF D'INHALATION | [2020/45] |
Former [2020/18] | DOSIERSYSTEM FÜR EINEN ZERSTÄUBER | ||
Former [2020/18] | DOSING SYSTEM FOR A NEBULIZER | ||
Former [2020/18] | SYSTÈME DE DOSAGE POUR UN NÉBULISEUR | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 17.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2018 | AL | 20.01.2021 | CY | 20.01.2021 | CZ | 20.01.2021 | DK | 20.01.2021 | EE | 20.01.2021 | FI | 20.01.2021 | HR | 20.01.2021 | LT | 20.01.2021 | LV | 20.01.2021 | MC | 20.01.2021 | MK | 20.01.2021 | MT | 20.01.2021 | NL | 20.01.2021 | PL | 20.01.2021 | RO | 20.01.2021 | RS | 20.01.2021 | SI | 20.01.2021 | SK | 20.01.2021 | SM | 20.01.2021 | TR | 20.01.2021 | BG | 20.04.2021 | IS | 20.05.2021 | PT | 20.05.2021 | LU | 19.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 19.06.2018 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
MK | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
TR | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 19.06.2018 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
MK | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 19.06.2018 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CY | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 19.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 20.01.2021 | |
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | CZ | 20.01.2021 | |
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 20.01.2021 | |
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0388106 (PY DANIEL C [US]); | [AD]EP1205199 (THE TECHNOLOGY PARTNERSHIP PLC [GB]); | [A]WO03061741 (PROFILE DRUG DELIVERY LTD [GB], et al); | [A]JP3563467B ; | [A]US2007068593 (BEHAR ALAIN [FR], et al); | [A]WO2011055243 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [AD]WO2015022436 (VECTURA GMBH [DE]); | [A]CN204995925U (SHANGHAI PULMONARY HOSPITAL) | by applicant | EP1205199 | EP1465692 | WO2008058941 | EP2496293 | EP2724741 | WO2015022436 |