EP3646103 - LARGE-FIELD-OF-VIEW WAVEGUIDE SUPPORTING RED, GREEN, AND BLUE IN ONE PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.08.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2021/42] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | ||
Former [2020/19] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERVO, Jani Kari Tapio MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18731668.2 | 25.05.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018US34518 | Priority number, date | US201715639163 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: US201715639163 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019005376 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3646103 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G02B5/18 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
G02B27/0172 (EP,US);
G02B5/1842 (US);
G02B27/0081 (US);
G02B27/0101 (US);
G02B5/18 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0123 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/19] | G02B27/01, G02B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | WELLENLEITER MIT GROSSEM SICHTFELD MIT UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON ROT, GRÜN UND BLAU IN EINER PLATTE | [2020/19] | English: | LARGE-FIELD-OF-VIEW WAVEGUIDE SUPPORTING RED, GREEN, AND BLUE IN ONE PLATE | [2020/19] | French: | GUIDE D'ONDES À GRAND CHAMP DE VISION ACCEPTANT LE ROUGE, LE VERT ET LE BLEU DANS UNE PLAQUE | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 25.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2013314789 (SAARIKKO PASI [FI], et al); | [XI]WO2016020643 (WAVE OPTICS LTD [GB]); | [E]EP3339936 (OCULUS VR LLC [US]) |