EP3632017 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MITIGATING DECODING ERRORS DUE TO PUNCTURING OF SYMBOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIRUCHERAI MURALIDHARAN, Vijayvaradharaj 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SOMICHETTY, Gowrisankar 5775 Morehouse drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
VUMMINTALA, Shashidhar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
BHATTAD, Kapil 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
BRESSANELLI, Dominique Francois 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18731935.5 | 16.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018US33039 | Priority number, date | IN201741018048 | 23.05.2017 Original published format: IN201741018048 | US201815980084 | 15.05.2018 Original published format: US201815980084 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018217517 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3632017 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
H04L1/0069 (EP,US);
H03M13/6362 (EP,US);
H04L1/0013 (EP,US);
H04L1/0068 (EP,US);
H04L1/0071 (US);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04W72/12 (US);
H03M13/1102 (EP,US);
H03M13/13 (EP,US);
H03M13/1515 (EP,US);
H03M13/152 (EP,US);
H03M13/23 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON DEKODIERUNGSFEHLERN AUFGRUND DER PUNKTIERUNG VON SYMBOLEN | [2020/15] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MITIGATING DECODING ERRORS DUE TO PUNCTURING OF SYMBOLS | [2020/15] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ATTÉNUER DES ERREURS DE DÉCODAGE DUES À LA PERFORATION DE SYMBOLES | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 28.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - NEC, "Details of Retuning Symbols for FeMTC in Rel-14", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1611717 DETAILS OF RETUNING SYMBOLS FOR FEMTC-V1A, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANC, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161113), XP051175687 [X] 1-5,11-16,22-25,27-29 * section 1, par. 1 * * section 1, first three items, and last item * * page 1, section 5.2.5 * * page 2, Proposal * [Y] 9,20,26,30 [I] 6-8,10,17-19,21 | [Y] - HUAWEI ET AL, "On the relationship between re-tuning time and bandwidth reduction", vol. RAN WG1, no. Ljubljana, Slovenia; 20141006 - 20141010, (20140927), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-143710, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_78b/Docs/, (20140927), XP050869396 [Y] 9,20,26,30 * page 3, 2nd par. after Case f * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Solutions supporting large HARQ-ACK payloads multiplexed with PUSCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-165150, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160514), XP051089832 [A] 10,21 * page 1, par. above Observation 1 * |