EP3634517 - TISSUE CONTACT INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states KCI Licensing, Inc. P.O. Box 659508 San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOCKE, Christopher, Brian 6 Bosworth Mews Bouenemouth BH9 3SD / GB | 02 /
COULTHARD, Richard, Daniel John 6 Acorn Way Verwood BH31 6LL / GB | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18733141.8 | 05.06.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018US36013 | Priority number, date | US201762516540P | 07.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762516540 P | US201762516566P | 07.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762516566 P | US201762516550P | 07.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762516550 P | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018226664 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3634517 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
A61M1/915 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/05 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/0206 (KR,US);
A61F13/0213 (KR,US);
A61F13/0223 (KR,US);
A61F13/15203 (KR,US);
A61F13/537 (KR,US);
A61L15/225 (KR);
A61L15/425 (KR);
A61M1/962 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/985 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2013/00217 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Title | German: | GEWEBEKONTAKTSCHNITTSTELLE | [2020/16] | English: | TISSUE CONTACT INTERFACE | [2020/16] | French: | INTERFACE DE CONTACT TISSULAIRE | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 23.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/32] | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014031771 (LOCKE CHRISTOPHER BRIAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-42 * paragraphs 0067, 0070; figure 3 *; | [A]US2015119830 (LUCKEMEYER JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1-42* figures 4A, 5 *; | [X]US2015320602 (LOCKE CHRISTOPHER BRIAN [GB], et al) [X] 1-42 * paragraphs 0005, 0029, 0046, 0047, 0055, 0058, 0062, 0063; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2015193257 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB]) [A] 1-42 * paragraphs 0047, 0064; figures 3A-C * |