EP3646388 - TWO-DIMENSIONAL ELECTRON GAS FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR, ASSOCIATED COMPONENT AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université de Montpellier 163, rue Auguste Broussonnet 34090 Montpellier / FR | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAYMOND, André 17 Enclos Pierre Loti 34130 Mauguio / FR | 02 /
CHAUBET, Christophe 17 rue des Chênes Verts 34820 Teyran / FR | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18733285.3 | 28.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018EP67393 | Priority number, date | FR20170055935 | 28.06.2017 Original published format: FR 1755935 | [2020/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019002453 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3646388 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/82, G01R33/06, H01L43/08, H01L29/205 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
H01L29/82 (EP);
G01R33/06 (EP);
G01R33/07 (EP);
H10N52/101 (EP);
H01L29/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | ZWEIDIMENSIONALER ELEKTRONENGASFELDEFFEKTTRANSISTOR, ZUGEHÖRIGE KOMPONENTE UND VERFAHREN | [2020/19] | English: | TWO-DIMENSIONAL ELECTRON GAS FIELD-EFFECT TRANSISTOR, ASSOCIATED COMPONENT AND METHODS | [2020/19] | French: | TRANSISTOR À EFFET DE CHAMP À GAZ D'ÉLECTRONS BIDIMENSIONNEL, COMPOSANT ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 27.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/37] | 06.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0381591 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5-10 * figures 5B, 13A, 14, 15 et texte associé *[I] 2-4; | [XI]US6809514 (ASHLEY TIMOTHY [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-10 * figure 16 et texte associé * [I] 2,6 |