EP3645627 - POLYPROPYLENE COMPOSITION WITH EXCELLENT SURFACE APPEARANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis AG Trabrennstrasse 6-8 1020 Vienna / AT | [2022/10] |
Former [2020/19] | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramer Straße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILEVA, Daniela Borealis Polyolefine GmbH St.-Peter-Straße 25 4021 Linz / AT | 02 /
KAHLEN, Susanne Borealis Polyolefine GmbH St.-Peter-Straße 25 4021 Linz / AT | 03 /
GRESTENBERGER, Georg Borealis Polyolefine GmbH St.-Peter-Straße 25 4021 Linz / AT | 04 /
SAGEDER, Anton Borealis Polyolefine GmbH St.-Peter-Straße 25 4021 Linz / AT | 05 /
WURNITSCH, Christof Borealis Polyolefine GmbH St.-Peter-Straße 25 4021 Linz / AT | 06 /
HARTL, Anna Borealis Polyolefine GmbH St.-Peter-Straße 25 4021 Linz / AT | 07 /
ROVER, Patrick Borealis Polyolefine GmbH St.-Peter-Straße 25 4021 Linz / AT | 08 /
PIRKLBAUER, Erwin Borealis Polyolefine GmbH St.-Peter-Straße 25 4021 Linz / AT | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18733614.4 | 26.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018EP67115 | Priority number, date | EP20170179064 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17179064 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019002294 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645627 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/12 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
C08L23/12 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C08J9/0061 (KR);
C08J9/0066 (KR);
C08K3/34 (KR,US);
C08K5/0083 (KR);
C08K5/09 (KR);
C08K5/092 (US);
C08K5/098 (KR,US);
C08L23/0815 (KR,US);
C08L23/14 (US);
C08L23/16 (KR);
C08J2323/12 (KR);
C08J2423/16 (KR);
C08L2203/14 (US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,EA);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/12, C08L23/16, C08K3/34, C08K5/098 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLENZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT AUSGEZEICHNETEM OBERFLÄCHENERSCHEINUNGSBILD | [2020/19] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE COMPOSITION WITH EXCELLENT SURFACE APPEARANCE | [2020/19] | French: | COMPOSITION DE POLYPROPYLÈNE PRÉSENTANT UN EXCELLENT ASPECT DE SURFACE | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 27.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2275485 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [XA]WO2011160945 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE ITALIA SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10,12,13 * example 1 * [A] 3-5,7-9,11,14-16; | [XA]WO2011160953 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE ITALIA SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10,12,13 * example 1 * [A] 3-5,7-9,11,14-16; | [A]EP2738215 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) [A] 1-16 * examples IE1-4, CE1-3 * | by applicant | WO8707620 | EP0491566 | WO9212182 | WO9219653 | WO9219658 | US5272236 | EP0586390 | EP0591224 | EP0887379 | WO9924478 | WO9924479 | WO0068315 | WO2004000899 | WO2004111095 | WO2010149529 | - Plastic Additives Handbook, (20010000), pages 967 - 990 | - Plastic Additives Handbook, (20090000), pages 1141 - 1190 | - SINGH, G.; KOTHARI, A.; GUPTA, V., Polymer Testing, (20090000), vol. 28 5, page 475 | - ZHOU, Z.; KUEMMERLE, R.; QIU, X.; REDWINE, D.; CONG, R.; TAHA, A.; BAUGH, D.; WINNIFORD, B., J. Mag. Reson., (20070000), vol. 187, page 225 | - BUSICO, V.; CARBONNIERE, P.; CIPULLO, R.; PELLECCHIA, R.; SEVERN, J.; TALARICO, G., Macromol. Rapid Commun., (20070000), vol. 28, page 1128 | - CHENG, H. N., Macromolecules, (19840000), vol. 17, page 1950 | - RESCONI, L.; CAVALLO, L.; FAIT, A.; PIEMONTESI, F., Chem. Rev., (20000000), vol. 100, page 1253 | - WANG, W-J.; ZHU, S., Macromolecules, (20000000), vol. 33, page 1157 | - BUSICO, V.; CIPULLO, R., Prog. Polym. Sci., (20010000), vol. 26, page 443 | - BUSICO, V.; CIPULLO, R.; MONACO, G.; VACATELLO, M.; SEGRE, A.L., Macromoleucles, (19970000), vol. 30, page 6251 | - KAKUGO, M.; NAITO, Y.; MIZUNUMA, K.; MIYATAKE, T., Macromolecules, (19820000), vol. 15, page 1150 | - KLIMKE, K.; PARKINSON, M.; PIEL, C.; KAMINSKY, W.; SPIESS, H.W.; WILHELM, M., Macromol. Chem. Phys., (20060000), vol. 207, page 382 | - PARKINSON, M.; KLIMKE, K.; SPIESS, H.W.; WILHELM, M., Macromol. Chem. Phys., (20070000), vol. 208, page 2128 | - CASTIGNOLLES, P.; GRAF, R.; PARKINSON, M.; WILHELM, M.; GABORIEAU, M., Polymer, (20090000), vol. 50, page 2373 | - NMR Spectroscopy of Polymers: Innovative Strategies for Complex Macromolecules, (20110000), vol. 401 | - POLLARD, M.; KLIMKE, K.; GRAF, R.; SPIESS, H.W.; WILHELM, M.; SPERBER, O.; PIEL, C.; KAMINSKY, W., Macromolecules, (20040000), vol. 37, page 813 | - FILIP, X.; TRIPON, C.; FILIP, C., J. Mag. Resn., (20050000), vol. 176, page 239 | - GRIFFIN, J.M.; TRIPON, C.; SAMOSON, A.; FILIP, C.; BROWN, S.P., Mag. Res. in Chem., (20070000), vol. 45, no. S 1, page S 198 | - J. RANDALL, Macromol. Sci., Rev. Macromol. Chem. Phys., (19890000), vol. C29, page 201 | - LIU, W.; RINALDI, P.; MCINTOSH, L.; QUIRK, P., Macromolecules, (20010000), vol. 34, page 4757 | - QIU, X.; REDWINE, D.; GOBBI, G.; NUAMTHANOM, A.; RINALDI, P., Macromolecules, (20070000), vol. 40, page 6879 | - SYBILLE FRANK et al., PPS 25 Intern. Conf. Polym. Proc. Soc 2009 or Proceedings of the SPIE, (20080000), vol. 6831, pages 68130T - 68130T,8 |