EP3624944 - A SAMPLE CARTRIDGE FOR INCUBATING AND/OR ANALYZING A DISPERSION OF PARTICLES, CELLS OR DROPLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blink AG Brüsseler Straße 20 07747 Jena / DE | [2021/33] |
Former [2020/13] | For all designated states Blink AG Winzerlaer Strasse 2 07745 Jena / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZ, Torsten Franz-Kugler-Straße 8 07749 Jena / DE | 02 /
ERMANTRAUT, Eugen Ziegenhainer Oberweg 54 Jena 07749 / DE | 03 /
STEINMETZER, Katrin Ricarda-Huch-Weg 23 07743 Jena / DE | 04 /
WOLFF, Alrik Glockenbecherweg 18 99425 Weimar (Tiefurt) / DE | [2020/19] |
Former [2020/13] | 01 /
SCHULZ, Torsten Franz-Kugler-Straße 8 07749 Jena / DE | ||
02 /
ERMANTRAUT, Eugen Ziegenhainer Oberweg 54 Jena 07749 / DE | |||
03 /
STEINMETZER, Katrin Ricarda-Huch-Weg 23 07743 Jena / DE | |||
04 /
WOLF, Alrik Glockenbecherweg 18 99425 Weimar (Tiefurt) / DE | Representative(s) | Engelhard, Markus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18733653.2 | 02.07.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018EP67819 | Priority number, date | EP20170179194 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17179194 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019002622 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624944 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01F3/08, B01F11/00, B01F11/02, B01F15/00, B01L7/00, G01N15/14 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
B01F23/41 (EP);
B01F23/4111 (EP,US);
B01F31/20 (EP,US);
B01F31/55 (EP);
B01F31/86 (EP);
B01F35/513 (EP,US);
B01L3/502776 (US);
B01L3/505 (EP,US);
C12M41/14 (US);
G01N15/1433 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0631 (EP);
B01L2200/0636 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0684 (EP,US);
B01L2300/042 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0832 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1822 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0409 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0457 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0481 (EP,US);
B01L2400/049 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0655 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1493 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | PROBENKARTUSCHE ZUM INKUBIEREN UND/ODER ZUR ANALYSE EINER DISPERSION VON PARTIKELN, ZELLEN ODER TROPFEN | [2020/13] | English: | A SAMPLE CARTRIDGE FOR INCUBATING AND/OR ANALYZING A DISPERSION OF PARTICLES, CELLS OR DROPLETS | [2020/13] | French: | CARTOUCHE D'ÉCHANTILLON POUR INCUBER ET/OU ANALYSER UNE DISPERSION DE PARTICULES, DE CELLULES OU DE GOUTTELETTES | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 19.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9414068 (EMPYREAN DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]); | [A]US2002086417 (CHEN SHUQI [US]); | [A]US2009074823 (TAKAKURA YOSHIHITO [JP]); | [A]EP2241314 (EZAKI GLICO CO [JP], et al); | [X]US2010317093 (TUREWICZ MAREK [US], et al); | [A]US2012156799 (KOMAREK ANDREW R [US], et al); | [A]US2014038272 (RIRIE KIRK MAX [US]); | [X]US2015096358 (PUTNAM DAVID [US], et al); | [X]US2017182493 (PERROUD THOMAS DANIEL [US], et al); | by applicant | EP0891811 | FR2803225 | WO03015923 | WO2007051861 | EP20160207455 |