EP3665091 - PACKAGE COMPRISING A RECLOSABLE OPENING ELEMENT AND AN INDICATOR ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/25] | PACKAGING HAVING A RECLOSABLE OPENING ELEMENT HAVING AN INDICATOR ELEMENT | ||
[2023/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PolyTaksys GmbH Im Paesch 11a 54340 Longuich / DE | [2023/45] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states PolyTaksys GmbH Im Paesch 11 54340 Longuich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REISERT, Steffen Hauptstrasse 11 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
HAUSER, Philippe Rheinhaldenstrasse 60 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 03 /
MALINDRETOS, Lars Zur Hainbuche 15 47804 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
RENNERS, Philip Goldstrasse 23a 48147 Münster / DE | [2023/32] |
Former [2020/25] | 01 /
REISERT, Steffen Hauptstrasse 11 52066 Aachen / DE | ||
02 /
HAUSER, Philippe Rheinhaldenstrasse 60 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | |||
03 /
MALINDRETOS, Lars Zur Hainbuche 15 47804 Krefeld / DE | |||
04 /
RENNERS, Philip Goldstrasse 23a 48147 Münster / CH | Representative(s) | Fabry, Bernd IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstrasse 523-525 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18734518.6 | 25.06.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018EP66853 | Priority number, date | DE201710117891 | 07.08.2017 Original published format: DE102017117891 | [2020/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019029892 | Date: | 14.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3665091 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3665091 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/74, B65D51/24, B65D79/02, // G01N33/14 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
B65D5/746 (EP);
B65D51/245 (EP);
B65D79/02 (EP);
B65D2203/12 (EP);
G01N33/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/25] | B65D5/74, B65D51/24, B65D79/02, G01N33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PACKUNG MIT EINEM WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBAREN ÖFFNUNGSELEMENT UND EINEM INDIKATORELEMENT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PACKUNG | [2023/12] | English: | PACKAGE COMPRISING A RECLOSABLE OPENING ELEMENT AND AN INDICATOR ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PACKAGE | [2023/12] | French: | EMBALLAGE COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT D'OUVERTURE REFERMABLE ET UN ÉLÉMENT INDICATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN EMBALLAGE | [2023/12] |
Former [2020/25] | PACKUNG MIT EINEM WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBAREN ÖFFNUNGSELEMENT MIT EINEM INDIKATORELEMENT | ||
Former [2020/25] | PACKAGING HAVING A RECLOSABLE OPENING ELEMENT HAVING AN INDICATOR ELEMENT | ||
Former [2020/25] | EMBALLAGE COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT D'OUVERTURE REFERMABLE POURVU D'UN ÉLÉMENT INDICATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 06.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 09.08.2023 | |
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 09.11.2023 | |
GR | 10.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2344101 (TAYLOR BRENT LEE [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10,12,15,17,18 * page 2 - page 9; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]DE102004019427 (KARDA PROJEKTENTWICKLUNG UND B [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,9,12,14,21 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0018] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 2,5,8,13,19,20; | [X]US2006256664 (VARON ABRAHAM [IL]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9-12,15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0117] * * figures 1-8 *; | [I]DE202009011274U (KILIC CUMA [DE]) [I] 1,2,4,6,9-11,14,19,20* paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0015] - [0025]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2017087524 (DESHPANDE SMITA [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,15,16 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | WO2012017244 |