EP3642848 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL WHOLE IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sirona Dental Systems GmbH Fabrikstr. 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMSON, Anders Speierlingweg 19 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
ERBACHER, Markus Entenstrich 6 68229 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
HAUTH, Steffen Taunusstraße 55 55246 MZ-Kostheim / DE | 04 /
VOSS, Björn Hauptstraße 7 69117 Heidelberg / DE | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Özer, Alpdeniz, et al Sirona Dental Systems GmbH Corporate Legal Fabrikstraße 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Özer, Alpdeniz, et al Dentsply Sirona Legal IP Department Fabrikstraße 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 18734781.0 | 20.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018EP66459 | Priority number, date | DE201710210222 | 20.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017210222 | [2020/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018234396 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3642848 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/50 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
G16H50/50 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T11/60 (US);
G06T5/50 (US);
G06T5/80 (US);
G16H30/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES ZWEIDIMENSIONALEN GESAMTBILDS | [2020/18] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL WHOLE IMAGE | [2020/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR GÉNÉRER UNE IMAGE GLOBALE BIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 20.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102014207667 (SIRONA DENTAL SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0014] , [0061]; claims 18,19 *[I] 2-15 |