EP3678993 - SYNTHESIS OF AFX FRAMEWORK TYPE MOLECULAR SIEVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, California 94583 / US | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Dan 6001 Bollinger Canyon Raod San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 02 /
JENSEN, Kurt Owen 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/35] |
Former [2020/29] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18734960.0 | 05.06.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018IB54000 | Priority number, date | US201715697777 | 07.09.2017 Original published format: US201715697777 | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019048940 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678993 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3678993 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/48, C01B39/02 | [2020/29] | CPC: |
C01B39/48 (EP,KR,US);
B01J29/70 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON MOLEKULARSIEBEN VOM AFX-RAHMEN-TYP | [2020/29] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF AFX FRAMEWORK TYPE MOLECULAR SIEVES | [2020/29] | French: | SYNTHÈSE DE TAMIS MOLÉCULAIRES DE TYPE À STRUCTURE AFX | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 12.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP2223894 (CHEVRON USA INC [US]) [X] 1 * example 7 * [A] 5-7 [I] 2-4; | [XAI]US2016060129 (BURTON ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0033] , [0036] * [A] 5-7 [I] 2-4; | [A]US2016096169 (RIVAS-CARDONA ALEJANDRA [US], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [XAI]US2017056870 (OJO ADEOLA FLORENCE [US], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 * [A] 5-7 [I] 2-4 | by applicant | US4508837 | US5194235 | US5370851 | US8562942 | - Chem. Eng. News, (19850000), vol. 63, no. 5, pages 26 - 27 | - A.N. PARIKH, Micropor. Mesopor. Mater., (20040000), vol. 76, pages 17 - 22 |