EP3645372 - STEERING SHAFT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUROT, Janick Unterbüntelistr. 2 9443 Widnau / CH | 02 /
BREUER, Marius 1178 Academy Drive 48307 Rochester Hills, Michigan / US | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/19] | 01 /
DUROT, Janick Unterbüntelistr. 2 9443 Widnau / CH | ||
02 /
BREUER, Marius 11242 Wolf Dancer Pass South, Apt. 200 Fishers, Indiana 46037 / US | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18735243.0 | 26.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018EP67120 | Priority number, date | DE201710114534 | 29.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017114534 | [2020/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019002298 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645372 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3645372 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/20, F16D3/06, F16C3/03 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
B62D1/20 (EP,US);
B62D1/185 (EP,US);
F16C3/03 (EP,US);
F16D3/06 (EP,US);
F16D3/38 (EP,US);
F16C2326/24 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LENKWELLE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN | [2020/19] | English: | STEERING SHAFT FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2020/19] | French: | ARBRE DE DIRECTION DE VÉHICULE À MOTEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 29.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.06.2018 | AL | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | DK | 28.07.2021 | |
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | DK | 28.07.2021 | |
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | DK | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | FI | 28.07.2021 | |
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 28.07.2021 | |
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE202010017747U (THYSSENKRUPP PRESTA AG [LI]) [AD] 1,13* paragraphs [0029] , [0030]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | US2006243089 | by applicant | DE19750005 | DE202010017747U | WO2016058723 |