EP3610248 - UNIVERSAL LIQUID SAMPLE DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR HIGH RESOLUTION TRANSMISSION ELECTRON MICROSCOPE IMAGING AND MULTIMODAL ANALYSES OF LIQUID SAMPLE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Battelle Memorial Institute P.O. Box 999 M/S K1-53 Richland, Washington 99352 / US | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Xiao-Ying 332 Scot Street Richland, WA 99354 / US | 02 /
KOVARIK, Libor 5404 Phoebe Lane West Richland, WA 99353 / US | 03 /
AREY, Bruce W. 5315 W. 15th Avenue Kennewick, WA 99338 / US | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Stuttard, Garry Philip Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Stuttard, Garry Philip Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18735431.1 | 09.04.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018US26708 | Priority number, date | US201715483939 | 10.04.2017 Original published format: US201715483939 | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018191167 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3610248 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/2204, H01J37/20 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
G01N23/2204 (EP);
H01J37/20 (EP);
H01J2237/2065 (EP);
H01J2237/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLE FLÜSSIGKEITSPROBENVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HOCHAUFLÖSENDEN TRANSMISSIONSELEKTRONENMIKROSKOPBILDGEBUNG UND MULTIMODALE ANALYSEN VON FLÜSSIGEN PROBENMATERIALIEN | [2020/08] | English: | UNIVERSAL LIQUID SAMPLE DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR HIGH RESOLUTION TRANSMISSION ELECTRON MICROSCOPE IMAGING AND MULTIMODAL ANALYSES OF LIQUID SAMPLE MATERIALS | [2020/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANTILLON LIQUIDE UNIVERSEL ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMAGERIE DE MICROSCOPE ÉLECTRONIQUE EN TRANSMISSION À HAUTE RÉSOLUTION ET ANALYSES MULTIMODALES DE MATÉRIAUX D'ÉCHANTILLON LIQUIDE | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 11.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 24.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2016068710 (UNIV DELFT TECH [NL]) [Y] 1-20 * page 1, line 7 - line 10 * * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 20 * * page 3, line 9 - line 32 * * page 4, line 2 - line 6 * * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 16 * * figure - *; | [Y]US2016071685 (KAWANISHI SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0047]; figures 2, 3a-3c * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060]; figures 6a,6b * * paragraph [0061]; figure 8 *; | [A]US9594034 (POMPA DONATO [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 29 - line 67; figure - * | by applicant | US8555710 |