EP3661658 - METHOD FOR COATING A MATERIAL WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2020/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMID, Martin Paradiesstrasse 15 89542 Bolheim / DE | [2020/24] | Application number, filing date | 18735546.6 | 27.06.2018 | [2020/24] | WO2018EP67174 | Priority number, date | DE201710117460 | 02.08.2017 Original published format: DE102017117460 | [2020/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019025084 | Date: | 07.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3661658 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B05C5/02, B05C15/00, B05C5/00, D21H23/48, B05B16/60 | [2020/24] | CPC: |
B05C5/0245 (EP,US);
B05B16/60 (EP,US);
B05C15/00 (EP,US);
B05C5/005 (EP,US);
B05C5/008 (EP);
B05C9/10 (EP,US);
B05D1/305 (US);
B05D3/0218 (US);
B05D3/0254 (US);
D21H23/48 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG EINER MATERIALBAHN | [2020/24] | English: | METHOD FOR COATING A MATERIAL WEB | [2020/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT D'UNE BANDE DE MATÉRIAU | [2020/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 02.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH03102276U (NA) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]DE10358754 (REAL OYJ ESPOO M [FI]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO2012041673 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102010031558 |