EP3655570 - TRANSFORMING A VALVE METAL LAYER INTO A TEMPLATE COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF SPACED (NANO)CHANNELS AND FORMING SPACED STRUCTURES THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Katholieke Universiteit Leuven K.U. Leuven R&D Waaistraat 6 Box 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANKOWSKI, Stanislaw Piotr c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Heverlee / BE | 02 /
VEREECKEN, Philippe M. c/o IMEC VZW Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | Winger Mouterij 16 bus 101 3190 Boortmeerbeek / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/22] | DenK iP Leuvensesteenweg 203 3190 Boortmeerbeek / BE | Application number, filing date | 18735609.2 | 10.07.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018EP68683 | Priority number, date | EP20170181782 | 18.07.2017 Original published format: EP 17181782 | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019016036 | Date: | 24.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3655570 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/04, C25D11/10, C25D11/12, C23F1/00, C25D1/00, C25D3/12 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
C25D1/006 (EP,KR,US);
C25D11/045 (EP,KR,US);
C23F1/00 (EP);
C23F1/20 (US);
C23F1/28 (EP,KR,US);
C25D1/08 (KR,US);
C25D11/022 (KR,US);
C25D11/024 (US);
C25D11/10 (EP,KR,US);
C25D11/12 (EP,KR,US);
C25D11/18 (US);
C25D11/24 (KR,US);
C25D11/34 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/12 (EP,KR,US);
C25D9/02 (US);
C25D9/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01B1/02 (US);
H01B5/002 (US);
H01M4/0404 (US);
H01M4/0407 (US);
H01M4/0442 (US);
H01M4/045 (US);
H01M4/0452 (US);
H01M4/0471 (US);
H01M4/661 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/72 (EP,KR);
H01M4/80 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0232 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0247 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2222/20 (EP,KR);
H01M4/86 (EP);
H01M4/8605 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/50 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Title | German: | UMWANDLUNG EINER VENTILMETALLSCHICHT IN EINE SCHABLONE MIT MEHREREN BEABSTANDETEN (NANO)KANÄLEN UND BILDUNG VON BEABSTANDETEN STRUKTUREN DARIN | [2020/22] | English: | TRANSFORMING A VALVE METAL LAYER INTO A TEMPLATE COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF SPACED (NANO)CHANNELS AND FORMING SPACED STRUCTURES THEREIN | [2020/22] | French: | TRANSFORMATION D'UNE COUCHE DE MÉTAL POUR VALVE EN UNE MATRICE COMPRENANT UNE PLURALITÉ DE (NANO)CANAUX ESPACÉS ET FORMATION DE STRUCTURES ESPACÉES DANS CELLE-CI | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 04.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009297913 (ZHANG GUIGEN [US], et al); | [XI]EP2562851 (UERGEN MUSTAFA K [TR], et al); | [XI]EP2980014 (IMEC VZW [BE], et al); | [XI]EP3026764 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) |