EP3549159 - TRANSPARENT FILM ERROR CORRECTION PATTERN IN WAFER GEOMETRY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kla-Tencor Corporation Legal Department One Technology Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Helen 48617 Tonopah Court Fremont CA 94539 / US | 02 /
ZENG, Andrew 134 Leal Way Fremont California 94539 / US | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [2024/32] |
Former [2019/41] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 18735858.5 | 05.01.2018 | [2019/41] | WO2018US12673 | Priority number, date | US201762443815P | 09.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762443815 P | US201715649259 | 13.07.2017 Original published format: US201715649259 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018129385 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549159 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3549159 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/66, G01B21/04, G01B11/06, G01B11/24, G01N21/84, G01N21/95 | [2020/37] | CPC: |
G01B21/045 (EP);
H01L22/12 (KR);
G01B11/0675 (EP,US);
G01B11/2441 (EP,US);
G01N21/8422 (EP,US);
G01N21/9501 (EP,US);
G01N21/956 (US);
H01L22/24 (KR);
H01L22/30 (KR);
G01B2210/56 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | H01L21/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEHLERKORREKTURMUSTER FÜR TRANSPARENTE FOLIE IN WAFERGEOMETRIESYSTEMEN | [2019/41] | English: | TRANSPARENT FILM ERROR CORRECTION PATTERN IN WAFER GEOMETRY SYSTEM | [2019/41] | French: | MOTIF DE CORRECTION D'ERREUR DE FILM TRANSPARENT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE GÉOMÉTRIE DE TRANCHE | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 05.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5129724 (BROPHY CHRIS P [US], et al); | [XI]US2007008551 (TANG SHOUHONG [US]); | [XI]US2010002950 (ARIELI YOEL [IL], et al); | [XI]EP2275868 (ZYGO CORP [US]) | International search | [X]US5042949 (GREENBERG JEFFREY S [US], et al); | [A]US2010265516 (DE GROOT PETER [US], et al); | [A]US2012021539 (ALLENIC ARNOLD [US], et al); | [A]JP2016145990 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV); | [A]JP2016225495 (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC) |