EP3565411 - METHODS OF REMOVING SPORES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARTHASARATHY, Ranjani V. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Ramesh C. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
SCHOLZ, Matthew T. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
SWANSON, Steven P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
VAIL, Andrew W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
RASMUSSEN, Jerald K. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
GRIESGRABER, George W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
HEAPY, Catherine D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 18736460.9 | 02.01.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018US12033 | Priority number, date | US201762442046P | 04.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762442046 P | [2019/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018128965 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3565411 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/44, A01N25/10, A01N25/34, A01N31/02, A61K8/34, A61L2/18, A61Q17/00, A61K8/02, A61K8/81, A61P31/04 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
A01N47/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A01N25/10 (US);
A01N31/02 (US);
A61K8/34 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61K8/84 (EP,US);
A61L2/0088 (EP,US);
A61L2/18 (EP);
A61L2/22 (EP);
A61L2/232 (EP);
A61L2/235 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61Q17/005 (EP,US);
A61K2800/884 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N47/44, A01N25/10, A01N31/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | A01N47/44, A61K8/34, A61L2/18, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON SPOREN | [2019/46] | English: | METHODS OF REMOVING SPORES | [2019/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ÉLIMINATION DE SPORES | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 18.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011152925 (SCHORR PHILLIP A [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0040] * * example 6 * * comparative example L * * claims 1, 5 *; | [Y]WO2012107847 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * examples 2-23 * * claims 16, 17 *; | [Y]WO2014209798 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0105] , [ 0106] , [ 0119] * * claims 1, 11, 12 *; | [YP]WO2017003923 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [YP] 1-15 * examples 10-14 ** claims 1, 17-25 * | International search | [A]US2008152614 (DUNSHEE WAYNE K [US]) [A] 1-5, 15 * entire document *; | [A]US2010040700 (CRUZ FELIX [US]) [A] 1-5, 15 * entire document *; | [A]US2015136698 (BOTHOF CATHERINE A [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 15 * entire document *; | [A]US2016115430 (SWANSON STEVEN P [US], et al) [A] 1-5, 15 * entire document *; | [PA]WO2017003923 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [PA] 1-5, 15* entire document * |